Commission On Human Rights and Opportunities v. 445 W. Putnam, LLC
Plaintiff: Commission on Human Rights & Opportunities
Defendant: JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller and 445 W. Putnam, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01767
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mirman, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 ENTERED IN ERROR Memorandum in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Zaccardelli, Lisa) Modified text on 12/27/2019 - wrong attorney from Hinckley, Allen & Snyder filed the Memo; memo will be refiled by Attorney Mirman. (Barry, Donna).
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Commission on Human Rights & Opportunities.Responses due by 12/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Roberts, Michael)
November 25, 2019 A telephonic pre-filing conference will be held 1/8/20 at 4:00 p.m. Defense counsel shall initiate the conference call to chambers: 203-773-2737. (Tooker, A.)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pre-Filing Conference. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/25/19. (Tooker, A.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pre-Filing Conference on Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 10) by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller. (Mirman, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice, for failure to comply with the Court's pre-filing conference requirement. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/18/19. (Tooker, A.)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller.Responses due by 12/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Mirman, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller, #4 Notice (Other) filed by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, #8 Standing Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller, #3 Notice (Other) filed by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller Signed by Clerk on 11/12/19. (Barry, Donna)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/08/19. (Barry, Donna)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/08/19. (Barry, Donna)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2020, Discovery due by 5/9/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2020 Signed by Clerk on 11/08/19. (Barry, Donna)
November 8, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Walker, J.)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC. (Mirman, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller OF PENDING MOTIONS (Mirman, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller TO COUNSEL RE: LOCAL RULE 5(b) (Mirman, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Mirman on behalf of 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller (Mirman, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller from Norwalk Housing Session, case number NWH-CV-19-6005291-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5530271, filed by 445 W. Putnam, LLC, JTM Realty, LLC, Jeffrey T. Miller.(Mirman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commission On Human Rights and Opportunities v. 445 W. Putnam, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JTM Realty, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Mirman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey T. Miller
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Mirman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 445 W. Putnam, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Mirman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commission on Human Rights & Opportunities
Represented By: Michael Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?