Bilal v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Murad Bilal
Defendant: Fairfield University Long Term Disability Plan and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01843
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 17, 2020 to File Rule 26 Report by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Begos, Patrick)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting the voluntary dismissal of defendant, Fairfield University Long Term Disability Plan, in accordance with the #9 stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/13/2019. (Sondergeld, C.)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Fairfield University Long Term Disability Plan by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Bennici, Gregory)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/9/2020 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Bennici, Gregory)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Begos, Patrick)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bennici on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Bennici, Gregory)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Fairfield University Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Skinner Rintoul* *Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, LLC* *1000 Lafayette Boulevard,P.O. Box 1740* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Bozek, M.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #1 Complaint filed by Murad Bilal. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2019.(Bozek, M.)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 11/18/2019.(Bozek, M.)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2020. Discovery due by 5/19/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/18/2019.(Bozek, M.)
November 18, 2019 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
November 18, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Rintoul, David)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5548815.), filed by Murad Bilal.(Rintoul, David) Modified on 11/18/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bilal v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murad Bilal
Represented By: David Skinner Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield University Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Gregory J. Bennici
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?