Canada Jetlines Ltd. et al v. Neeleman et al
Plaintiff: Canada Jetlines Ltd. and Canada Jetlines Operations Ltd.
Defendant: DGN Corporation, David Neeleman and Breeze Aviation Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01850
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying as moot #15 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/17/2020. (Smith, E)
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/312020 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 Complaint by Breeze Aviation Group, Inc., DGN Corporation, David Neeleman. (Sandler, Erick)
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/17/2020 to respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Breeze Aviation Group, Inc., DGN Corporation, David Neeleman. (Sandler, Erick)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/3/2020 To Answer 1 Complaint by Breeze Aviation Group, Inc., DGN Corporation, David Neeleman. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/10/2019. (Smith, E)
December 10, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Breeze Aviation Group, Inc. to 1/3/2020; DGN Corporation to 1/3/2020; David Neeleman to 1/3/2020. (Smith, E)
December 4, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Breeze Aviation Group, Inc. to 12/12/2019; DGN Corporation to 12/12/2019; David Neeleman to 12/13/2019. (Oliver, T.)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendant DGN Corportion on 11/21/2019, filed by Canada Jetlines Ltd., Canada Jetlines Operations Ltd.. (Barrack, David)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendant Breeze Aviation on 11/21/2019, filed by Canada Jetlines Ltd., Canada Jetlines Operations Ltd.. (Barrack, David)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendant David Neeleman on 11/22/2019, filed by Canada Jetlines Ltd., Canada Jetlines Operations Ltd.. (Barrack, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/3/2020 To Answer #1 Complaint by Breeze Aviation Group, Inc., DGN Corporation, David Neeleman. (Sandler, Erick)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Breeze Aviation Group, Inc., DGN Corporation. (Sandler, Erick)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erick M. Sandler on behalf of Breeze Aviation Group, Inc., DGN Corporation, David Neeleman (Sandler, Erick)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Canada Jetlines Ltd., Canada Jetlines Operations Ltd.. (Barrack, David)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Breeze Aviation Group, Inc., DGN Corporation, David Neeleman* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Loren Barrack* *Winslett Studnicky McCormick & Boomser LLP* *6 East 39th Street Ste 6th Floor* *New York, NY 10016*. (Fazekas, J.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Canada Jetlines Operations Ltd., Canada Jetlines Ltd., #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 11/20/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/19/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/19/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2020. Discovery due by 5/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/24/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5552066.), filed by Canada Jetlines Ltd., Canada Jetlines Operations Ltd.(Barrack, David)
November 19, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Walker, J.)
November 19, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Barrack, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canada Jetlines Ltd. et al v. Neeleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canada Jetlines Ltd.
Represented By: David Loren Barrack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canada Jetlines Operations Ltd.
Represented By: David Loren Barrack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DGN Corporation
Represented By: Erick M. Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Neeleman
Represented By: Erick M. Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breeze Aviation Group, Inc.
Represented By: Erick M. Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?