Joyner v. Hailey et al
Plaintiff: Monica Joyner
Defendant: Marlene Waradzin, Lauren K. Baldwin, Susan S. Hailey, Virginia Sullivan, Elizabeth Dmowski and United States
Case Number: 3:2019cv01851
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time for the parties to complete their Rule 26(f) conference until 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to dismiss. The deadline for filing the parties' joint 25(f) conference report will be set for 14 days following the parties' Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/13/2019. (Leon, Noel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after the Court rules on ECF No. 9 to hold the parties' Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference, and related deadlines by United States. (Elicker, Natalie)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 and #11 Motions to Amend/Correct, to amend the case caption and replace named defendant Elizabeth Dmowski with the United States of America. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/27/2019. (Leon, Noel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal to Substitute the United States for Elizabeth Dmowski, by Elizabeth Dmowski, United States. (Fazekas, J.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by United States re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss (As Required by Local Rule 12(a)) (Attachments: #1 Fed. R. Civ. P. 12, #2 D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7)(Elicker, Natalie)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States.Responses due by 12/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - M. Torres Decl.)(Elicker, Natalie)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States Of Substitution Of The United States For Elizabeth Dmowski And Motion To Amend The Case Caption (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decl. of M. Torres)(Elicker, Natalie) Modified on 11/27/2019 to add motion relief (Perez, J.).
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT (Certification of Scope of Employment, referenced in #1 Removal) by Elizabeth Dmowski re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Elicker, Natalie)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Elizabeth Dmowski, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Natalie Nicole Elicker on behalf of Elizabeth Dmowski, #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 11/20/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/19/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/19/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2020. Discovery due by 5/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/24/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 19, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Nicole Elicker on behalf of Elizabeth Dmowski (Elicker, Natalie) Modified text to remove party on 11/19/2019 (Anastasio, F.).
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Elizabeth Dmowski, United States from Conn. Super Ct. J.D. New Haven at New Haven, case number NNH-CV19-5047004-S., filed by Elizabeth Dmowski (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons, #2 State Court Complaint)(Elicker, Natalie) Modified text to remove party on 11/19/2019 (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joyner v. Hailey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Waradzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren K. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan S. Hailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Dmowski
Represented By: Natalie Nicole Elicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Natalie Nicole Elicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?