Carrano v. CBS Corp. et al
Plaintiff: John A. Carrano
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, CBS Corp., General Electric Company and Crane Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01875
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 3/13/2020 10:00 AM in West Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert A. Richardson. (Ferriter-Russo, Emily)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER A settlement conference is scheduled for 3/13/20 at 10:00 AM with Judge Richardson. Please see attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 1/23/20. (Ferriter-Russo, Emily)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER re: Case Management Plan. Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2020. Discovery due by 10/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2021. Status Report due by 4/15/2020. Trial Brief due by 1/15/2021. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/17/2020. (Reis, Julia)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for settlement conference SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/17/2020.(Lewis, D)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Dismiss. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/16/2020. (Lewis, D)
January 13, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Foster Wheeler by John A. Carrano.Responses due by 2/3/2020 (Kenney, Brian)
January 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by General Electric Company Joinder in Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mohan, Catherine)
January 10, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lyons, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by CBS Corp. Joinder in Removal (Martin, Robert)
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corp.. (Martin, Robert)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Martin on behalf of CBS Corp. (Martin, Robert)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Crane Co. Statement of Compliance with Standing Orders in Removed Cases (Lyons, Thomas)
December 4, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2020 (Lewis, D)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company (Sheldon, Tara)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Co., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Crane Co., #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crane Co., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Standing Protective Order, #8 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/25/2019. (Reis, Julia)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/25/2019. (Reis, Julia)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/25/2019. (Reis, Julia)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/24/2020. Discovery due by 5/26/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/25/2019. (Reis, Julia)
November 25, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Lyons, Thomas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Crane Co. re: Notice of Pending Motions (Lyons, Thomas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Co. from Bridgeport Superior Court, case number FBT-CV-19-6090774-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5560967, filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2: Friemoth, #3 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 1, #4 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 2, #5 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 3, #6 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 4, #7 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 5, #8 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 6, #9 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 1, #10 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 2, #11 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 3, #12 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 4, #13 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 5, #14 Exhibit 5: State Notice of Removal, #15 Certificate of Service)(Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrano v. CBS Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp.
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Carrano
Represented By: Brian P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?