Rojas v. Middlesex Hospital
Plaintiff: Jessica Rojas
Defendant: Middlesex Hospital
Case Number: 3:2019cv01876
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Michaud, Megan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Middlesex Hospital.(Reilly, Patricia)
December 2, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Middlesex Hospital to 1/2/2020. (Smith, E)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 2, 2020 to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/2/2019. (Smith, E)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 2, 2020 to Respond to Complaint by Middlesex Hospital. (Reilly, Patricia)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jessica Rojas. (Michaud, Megan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Leigh Michaud on behalf of Jessica Rojas (Michaud, Megan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #9 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Middlesex Hospital, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Middlesex Hospital, #7 Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal filed by Middlesex Hospital, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Middlesex Hospital, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Martha McNamara Royston on behalf of Middlesex Hospital, #10 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Patricia E. Reilly on behalf of Middlesex Hospital, #6 Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases filed by Middlesex Hospital Signed by Clerk on 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/24/2020. Discovery due by 5/26/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Middlesex Hospital (Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reilly, Patricia)
November 25, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Walker, J.)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Middlesex Hospital (Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Reilly, Patricia)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Middlesex Hospital (of Pending Motions) (Reilly, Patricia)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Middlesex Hospital. (Reilly, Patricia)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha McNamara Royston on behalf of Middlesex Hospital (Royston, Martha)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia E. Reilly on behalf of Middlesex Hospital (Reilly, Patricia)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Middlesex Hospital from Superior Court J.D. of Middlesex at Middletown, case number MMX-CV19-6026669-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5561128, filed by Middlesex Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Reilly, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojas v. Middlesex Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rojas
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Represented By: Megan Leigh Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middlesex Hospital
Represented By: Martha McNamara Royston
Represented By: Patricia E. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?