Estate of Kenny Richie Marty Mitchel v. Hapgood
Plaintiff: Estate of Kenny Richie Marty Mitchel
Defendant: Gavin Scott Hapgood and Scott Hapgood
Case Number: 3:2019cv01914
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Gavin Scott Hapgood to 2/6/2020. (Smith, E)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 6, 2020 To Plead 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/29/2020. (Smith, E)
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas B. Watson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5658688) by Gavin Scott Hapgood. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Conroy, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 6, 2020 To Plead #1 Complaint by Gavin Scott Hapgood. (Conroy, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Conroy on behalf of Gavin Scott Hapgood (Conroy, Michael)
January 3, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Gavin Scott Hapgood to 1/27/2020. (Smith, E)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Treating the stipulation as a joint motion to extend time, the motion is granted. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/3/2020. (Smith, E)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/27/2020for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Estate of Kenny Richie Marty Mitchel. (Seligman, Steven)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Kenny Richie Marty Mitchel. Gavin Scott Hapgood served on 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Return)(Seligman, Steven)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Gavin Scott Hapgood* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven L. Seligman* *Katz & Seligman* *130 Washington St.* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Fazekas, J.)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Estate of Kenny Richie Marty Mitchel Signed by Clerk on 12/4/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/4/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/4/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/2/2020. Discovery due by 6/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/9/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/4/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 4, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)
December 4, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Gavin Scott Hapgood. (Seligman, Steven)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gavin Scott Hapgood ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5574446.), filed by Estate of Kenny Richie Marty Mitchel.(Seligman, Steven) Modified on 12/4/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Kenny Richie Marty Mitchel v. Hapgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Scott Hapgood
Represented By: Michael C. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Hapgood
Represented By: Michael C. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Kenny Richie Marty Mitchel
Represented By: Steven L. Seligman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?