Emigh v. Central Connecticut State University et al
Plaintiff: Brooke Emigh
Defendant: Thomas Delventhal and Central Connecticut State University
Case Number: 3:2019cv01934
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Thomas Delventhal to 3/9/2020. (Barry, Donna)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, absent objection, to 3/9/20. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/5/20. (Tooker, Aimee)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/09/2020 To File Responsive Pleading by Thomas Delventhal. (Mercier, Marc)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc P. Mercier on behalf of Thomas Delventhal (Mercier, Marc)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Thomas Delventhal waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/8/2020 filed by Brooke Emigh. (Garcia Quintner, Maria)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Central Connecticut State University, Thomas Delventhal* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Maria Eugenia Garcia Quintner* *Mgq Law, LLC* *246 Post Road East, 2nd flr* *Westport, CT 06880*. (Pesta, J.)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Brooke Emigh, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 12/10/19.(Pesta, J.)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/9/19.(Pesta, J.)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/9/19.(Pesta, J.)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2020 Discovery due by 6/9/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2020 Signed by Clerk on 12/9/19.(Pesta, J.)
December 9, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)
December 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Garcia Quintner, Maria)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5582520.), filed by Brooke Emigh.(Garcia Quintner, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emigh v. Central Connecticut State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Delventhal
Represented By: Marc P. Mercier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Connecticut State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Emigh
Represented By: Maria Eugenia Garcia Quintner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?