Weldon v. Cheap Auto Rental LLC
Plaintiff: Macy Weldon
Defendant: Cheap Auto Rental LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01957
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. A responsive pleading is now due by February 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/2/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
January 2, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Cheap Auto Rental LLC to 2/7/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February, 7 2020 Time to Plead #1 Complaint by Cheap Auto Rental LLC. (Zak, Karen)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Janet Zak on behalf of Cheap Auto Rental LLC (Zak, Karen)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Macy Weldon. Cheap Auto Rental LLC served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Blinn, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cheap Auto Rental LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Macy Weldon, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2020. Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cheap Auto Rental LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5588585.), filed by Macy Weldon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit retail installment contract)(Blinn, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cheap Auto Rental LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)
December 12, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weldon v. Cheap Auto Rental LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheap Auto Rental LLC
Represented By: Karen Janet Zak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macy Weldon
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?