Khan v. Yale University et al
Plaintiff: Saifullah Khan
Defendant: Stephanie Spangler, Jane Doe, Paul Genecin, Carole Goldberg, Marvin Chun, Mark Solomon, David Post, Lynn Cooley, Ann Kuhlman, Sarah Demers, Jonathon Halloway, Peter Salovey, Unknown Persons, Yale University and Joe Gordon
Case Number: 3:2019cv01966
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Referring Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER ON JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDUM attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/5/2020. (Cahill, Leslie)
February 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Conference Line: (888) 278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Cahill, Leslie)
February 5, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 2/24/2020.Discovery due by 2/26/2021.Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2021.Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley.Answer Deadlines Updated for All Defendants. Responsive pleading due 3/24/2020. (Cahill, Leslie)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. The Court has reviewed the Parties' #16 Rule 26(f) Report. It is Approved, Adopted, and So Ordered, except that the Parties' Joint Trial Memorandum shall be filed in accordance with the deadlines and procedures set forth below. Pursuant to Local Rule 16(b), the Court orders as follows: The Plaintiff shall move to amend the pleadings or move to join additional parties by February 24, 2020. The Defendants shall move to join additional parties by February 24, 2020 and shall respond to the complaint by March 24, 2020. Discovery shall be completed by February 26, 2021. Dispositive motions, if any (see Local Rule 56(c)), shall be filed by March 30, 2021. The Joint Trial Memorandum shall comport with this Court's standing order, which will be separately docketed. The date for filing the Joint Trial Memorandum required by this Court's standing order shall be set by the Court after the close of discovery. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for March 5, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/5/2020. (Cahill, Leslie)
February 3, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Noonan, Patrick)
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Gooley on behalf of Jane Doe (Gooley, Brendan)
January 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Sconzo on behalf of Jane Doe (Sconzo, James)
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jane Doe waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020 filed by Saifullah Khan. (Pattis, Norman)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Permission to Litigate Claims Against Jane Doe Using a Pseudonym in Place of Her Actual Name without prejudice. Based upon consideration of the inherently sensitive and personal nature of the issues raised in this litigation, the parties' acknowledgment of the Defendant Yale University's applicable policies concerning confidentiality, the risk of harm and the absence of prejudice to the litigants, the lack of an alternative procedure for maintaining Jane Doe's confidentiality, and other relevant factors, see Sealed Plaintiff v. Sealed Defendant, 537 F.3d 185, 189-90 (2d Cir. 2008), the Court grants the motion to proceed by way of a pseudonym. The motion is granted without prejudice insofar as Jane Doe has not yet appeared in this action. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/10/2020. (Cahill, Leslie)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/8/2020.(Bozek, M.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of Marvin Chun, Lynn Cooley, Sarah Demers, Paul Genecin, Carole Goldberg, Joe Gordon, Jonathon Halloway, Ann Kuhlman, David Post, Peter Salovey, Mark Solomon, Stephanie Spangler, Yale University (Noonan, Patrick)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Pemission to Litigate Against Jane Doe using a Pseudonym in Place of her Actual Name , #7 MOTION to Proceed in Fictitious Name filed by Marvin Chun, Lynn Cooley, Sarah Demers, Paul Genecin, Carole Goldberg, Joe Gordon, Jonathon Halloway, Ann Kuhlman, David Post, Peter Salovey, Mark Solomon, Stephanie Spangler, Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Paul Genecin waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020; David Post waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020; Yale University waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020; Sarah Demers waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020; Joe Gordon waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020; Peter Salovey waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020; Ann Kuhlman waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020; Stephanie Spangler waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020; Carole Goldberg waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020; Mark Solomon waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020; Jonathon Halloway waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020; Lynn Cooley waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020; Marvin Chun waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/16/2020 filed by Saifullah Khan. (Pattis, Norman)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Permission to Litigate Claims Against Jane Doe using a Pseudonym in Place of her Actual Name - EXHIBIT by Saifullah Khan re #2 MOTION for Pemission to Litigate Against Jane Doe using a Pseudonym in Place of her Actual Name . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Pattis, Norman) Modified on 12/18/2019 to change to motion event/relief (Bozek, M.).
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Marvin Chun, Lynn Cooley, Sarah Demers, Jane Doe, Paul Genecin, Carole Goldberg, Joe Gordon, Jonathon Halloway, Ann Kuhlman, David Post, Peter Salovey, Mark Solomon, Stephanie Spangler, Unknown Persons, Yale University* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Norman A. Pattis* *The Pattis Law Firm, LLC* *383 Orange St., First Floor* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Bozek, M.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 MOTION for Pemission to Litigate Against Jane Doe using a Pseudonym in Place of her Actual Name filed by Saifullah Khan, #1 Complaint filed by Saifullah Khan, #4 Electronic Filing Order, and #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2019.(Bozek, M.)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/13/2019.(Bozek, M.)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/11/2020. Discovery due by 6/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2019.(Bozek, M.)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Pemission to Litigate Against Jane Doe using a Pseudonym in Place of her Actual Name by Saifullah Khan.Responses due by 1/3/2020 (Pattis, Norman) Modified on 1/13/2020 (Gould, K.).
December 13, 2019 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Walker, J.)
December 13, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Pattis, Norman)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5590669.), filed by Saifullah Khan.(Pattis, Norman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Yale University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Spangler
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Represented By: James M. Sconzo
Represented By: Brendan Gooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Genecin
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carole Goldberg
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Chun
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Solomon
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Post
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Cooley
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Kuhlman
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Demers
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon Halloway
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Salovey
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Persons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale University
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Gordon
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saifullah Khan
Represented By: Norman A. Pattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?