Evans et al v. Delta Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alayna Vargas and Theresa Evans
Defendant: Delta Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01976
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Theresa Evans, Alayna Vargas.(Sorrentino, Bradley)
February 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley L. Sorrentino on behalf of Theresa Evans, Alayna Vargas (Sorrentino, Bradley)
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Faldu, Shrina)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBIT One to Defendant's Opposition to Default Entry by Delta Airlines, Inc. re #14 Objection. (Laurie, Robert)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Default Entry by Delta Airlines, Inc.. (Laurie, Robert)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Delta Airlines, Inc..(Laurie, Robert)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Delta Airlines, Inc. of Service of Documents (Laurie, Robert)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #10 Standing Protective Order, #5 Statement of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases filed by Delta Airlines, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Delta Airlines, Inc., #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Shrina B. Faldu on behalf of Delta Airlines, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert D. Laurie on behalf of Delta Airlines, Inc., #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Delta Airlines, Inc., #9 Electronic Filing Order, #7 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Delta Airlines, Inc. filed by Theresa Evans, Alayna Vargas, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Delta Airlines, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/17/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/17/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2020. Discovery due by 6/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/17/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 17, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Delta Airlines, Inc. by Theresa Evans, Alayna Vargas. (Hushin, Z.)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shrina B. Faldu on behalf of Delta Airlines, Inc. (Faldu, Shrina)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Delta Airlines, Inc. Statement of Compliance With Standing Order on Removed Cases (Laurie, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Delta Airlines, Inc. of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Laurie, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delta Airlines, Inc.. (Laurie, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Laurie on behalf of Delta Airlines, Inc. (Laurie, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Airlines, Inc. from Superior Court J.D. of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-CV19-6089206-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BCTDC-5595341, filed by Delta Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Laurie, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans et al v. Delta Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Laurie
Represented By: Shrina B. Faldu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alayna Vargas
Represented By: Bradley L. Sorrentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Evans
Represented By: Bradley L. Sorrentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?