USA et al v. Med Tech LLC et al
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut and USA
Defendant: Med Tech LLC and Thomas Macre
Case Number: 3:2019cv01986
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Pipech, L.)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of the United States and the State of Connecticut in the amount of $193,879.23, plus interest of 3.00% per month on the unpaid balance beginning April 1, 2019.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2020.(Pipech, L.)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Judgment in light of ECF No. 6. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 2/3/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Approved. So ORDERED re #5 Stipulation filed by USA. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 2/3/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 Joint STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Judgment based on Settlement and Stipulated Judgment Application for Entry of Judgment by USA. (Thidemann, Anne)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/18/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 18, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Teitelman on behalf of State of Connecticut (Teitelman, Robert)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Judgment based on Settlement and Stipulated Judgment by State of Connecticut, United States Of America.Responses due by 1/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement and Attachments to Settlement Agreement)(Thidemann, Anne)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Macre, Med Tech LLC, filed by United States Of America, State of Connecticut.(Thidemann, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA et al v. Med Tech LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Robert B. Teitelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Anne F. Thidemann
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med Tech LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Macre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?