USA v. $119,449.00 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $6,088.00 in United States Currency, $119,449.00 in United States Currency and $14,640.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Jose Polanco and Venancia Polanco
Case Number: 3:2019cv01995
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to 2/26/2020 to file a verified claim. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/27/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
January 24, 2020 Filing 14 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem Returned Executed (Reis, Julia)
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 26, 2020 File a Verified Claim by Venancia Polanco. (Kaloidis, Ioannis)
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ioannis A. Kaloidis on behalf of Venancia Polanco (Kaloidis, Ioannis)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as moot #8 Motion for Extension of Time in light of ECF No. 10. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/24/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 2/27/2020 to file a verified claim. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/24/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 27, 2020 file verified claim by Jose Polanco. (Thibodeau, Daniel)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 27, 2020 File Verified Claim by Jose Polanco. (Thibodeau, Daniel)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Thibodeau on behalf of Jose Polanco (Thibodeau, Daniel)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by USA (Nelson, David)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by USA, #2 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 20, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $119,449.00 in United States Currency, $14,640.00 in United States Currency, $6,088.00 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Nelson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $119,449.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jose Polanco
Represented By: Daniel C. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Venancia Polanco
Represented By: Ioannis A. Kaloidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Represented By: David Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,088.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $119,449.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,640.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?