Langston v. USA
Plaintiff: Allasia Langston
Defendant: United States Of America and USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv02020
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Updated Answer deadline for USA to 3/9/2020 per #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. (Peterson, M)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allasia Langston. USA served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Scully, Kevin)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *USA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Kevin D Scully* *Kernan, Scully & McDonald, LLP* *P.O. Box 2156, 207 Bank Street* *Waterbury, CT 06722*. (Peterson, M)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Allasia Langston, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 01/02/2020. (Peterson, M)
January 2, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Allasia Langston. (Scully, Kevin)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/31/2019. (Peterson, M)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/31/2019. (Peterson, M)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/29/2020. Discovery due by 7/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/31/2019. (Peterson, M)
December 31, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Of America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5613790.), filed by Allasia Langston.(Scully, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langston v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allasia Langston
Represented By: Kevin D Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?