Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC v. Munchkin, Inc

Plaintiff: International Refills Company Ltd. and Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC
Defendant: Munchkin, Inc
Not Yet Classified: Stephen Mowers
Case Number: 3:2019mc00039
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Donna F Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order on Motion to Compel served on Stephen Mowers on May 22, 2019, filed by Munchkin, Inc. (Hinton, Robert)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Compel Subpoena Compliance. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 5/15/19. (Brooks, Lucia)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Hinton on behalf of Munchkin, Inc (Hinton, Robert)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/19. (Wood, R.)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/19. (Wood, R.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Keith E. Broyles to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5269293) by Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Motions referred to Donna F. Martinez(Cunningham, Marina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2019: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wood, R.).
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Pamela Holland Councill to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5269259) by Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Motions referred to Donna F. Martinez(Cunningham, Marina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2019: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wood, R.).
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER re #1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Compliance (paid $47 fee; receipt number ACTDC-5215079) by Munchkin, Inc. (Hinton, Robert)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marina F. Cunningham on behalf of Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC (Cunningham, Marina)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric D. Sidler. Signed by Clerk on 04/10/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Travis W. McCallon. Signed by Clerk on 04/10/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric D. Sidler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5230137) by Munchkin, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission and Certificate of Good Standing)Motions referred to Donna F. Martinez(Hinton, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Travis W. McCallon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5230128) by Munchkin, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission and Certificate of Good Standing)Motions referred to Donna F. Martinez(Hinton, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion to Compel Attendance at Deposition served on Stephen Mowers on April 3, 2019, filed by Munchkin, Inc. (Hinton, Robert)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez for all pretrial matters excluding trial, unless the parties consent to trial before the magistrate judge, and for a ruling on #1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Compliance . So ordered by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/1/2019.(Pipech, L.)
April 1, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 03/29/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Compliance (paid $47 fee; receipt number ACTDC-5215079), filed by Munchkin, Inc.Responses due by 4/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hinton, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC v. Munchkin, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Refills Company Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC
Represented By: Marina F. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munchkin, Inc
Represented By: Robert C. Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Stephen Mowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?