USA et al v. Children's Behavioral Therapy et al
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut and USA
Defendant: Channa Sontag and Children's Behavioral Therapy
Case Number: 3:2020cv00110
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Freberg, B)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT JUDGMENT entered in favor of USA and State of Connecticut and against Children's Behavioral Therapy and Channa Sontag.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/28/2020.(Freberg, B)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT JUDGMENT (Doc. #2). The Court GRANTS the motion for consent judgment for the reasons stated in the motion. The Court shall enter judgment in accordance with the proposed stipulated judgment and close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/27/2020. (Freberg, B)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by State of Connecticut, USA, #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by State of Connecticut, USA Signed by Clerk on 1/27/2020.(Freberg, B)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/24/2020.(Freberg, B)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/24/2020.(Freberg, B)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/24/2020; Discovery due by 7/25/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 8/29/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2020.(Freberg, B)
January 24, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by State of Connecticut, United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Stipulated Judgment)(Thidemann, Anne)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States, State of Connecticut.(Thidemann, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA et al v. Children's Behavioral Therapy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Karla A. Turekian
Represented By: Michael E. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Anne F. Thidemann
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Channa Sontag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children's Behavioral Therapy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?