Schlosser v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Schlosser
Defendant: Cheryl Cepelak, Rollin Cook, Jeanette Maldonado, Allison Black, Monica Rinaldi and Denise Walker
Case Number: 3:2020cv00113
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey Schlosser (Payton, R.)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 2/20/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 1/30/20.(Payton, R.)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 01/21/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 01/21/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 01/21/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS - MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jeffrey Schlosser. (Fazekas, J.)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffrey Schlosser. (Fazekas, J.)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Allison Black, Cheryl Cepelak, Rollin Cook, Jeanette Maldonado, Monica Rinaldi, Denise Walker, filed by Jeffrey Schlosser. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlosser v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Cepelak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rollin Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Rinaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Schlosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?