Roman v. Hartford Auto Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Celio Roman
Defendant: Hartford Auto Group, Inc., Credit Acceptance Corporation and Hartford Auto Group, Inc. doing business as MAC Mitsubishi
Case Number: 3:2020cv00120
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Stay All Proceedings in This Action. Response/reply due by 4/17/2020. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/26/2020. (Garcia, A.)
March 25, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Stay All Proceedings in This Action until April 17, 2020 by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Canter, Nelson)
March 18, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/27/2020 (Perez, J.)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Default Entry 55(a). Defendants have expressed an intent to respond to the Complaint and the Second Circuit has expressed its preference that cases be decided on the merits. See Enron Oil Corp. v. Diakuhara, 10 F.3d 90, 95 (2d Cir. 1993). Disposition of a case by default is "an extreme sanction" that "must remaina weapon of last, rather than first, resort." Meehan v. Snow, 652 F.2d 274, 277 (2d Cir. 1981). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/14/2020. (Garcia, A.)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Response to Complaint due by May 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/14/2020. (Garcia, A.)
March 13, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Hartford Auto Group, Inc. to 5/1/2020. (Fazekas, J.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until May 1, 2020 Reply to Complaint by Hartford Auto Group, Inc.. (Armon, Regina)
March 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina P Armon on behalf of Hartford Auto Group, Inc. (Armon, Regina)
March 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Lorenz Mahoney on behalf of Celio Roman (Mahoney, Brendan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) for failure to plead as to Hartford Auto Group, Inc. by Celio Roman. (Blinn, Daniel)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Stay All Proceedings in This Action filed by Celio Roman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Celio Roman, #2 Order Re: Criscione v. Atlantic Motors, et al)(Blinn, Daniel)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Canter, Nelson)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and, MOTION to Stay All Proceedings in This Action by Credit Acceptance Corporation.Responses due by 3/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Contract, #3 Exhibit B - E-Signature Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Canter, Nelson)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Celio Roman. Hartford Auto Group, Inc. served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Blinn, Daniel)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Celio Roman. Credit Acceptance Corporation served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. (Blinn, Daniel)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Auto Group, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Fazekas, J.)
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Credit Acceptance Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Fazekas, J.)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Celio Roman, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 01/29/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/27/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/27/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/27/2020. Discovery due by 7/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2020. Signed by Clerk on 01/27/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 27, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit Acceptance Corporation, Hartford Auto Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5659109.), filed by Celio Roman.(Blinn, Daniel)
January 27, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Auto Group, Inc.. (Blinn, Daniel)
January 27, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Blinn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman v. Hartford Auto Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Auto Group, Inc.
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Nelson E. Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Auto Group, Inc. doing business as MAC Mitsubishi
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celio Roman
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Represented By: Brendan Lorenz Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?