Miranda v. Westover School, Inc.
Plaintiff: Emily Miranda
Defendant: Westover School, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00123
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 17 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ponvert, Antonio)
February 27, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/2/2020; Answer deadline updated for Westover School, Inc. to 4/2/2020. (Barry, Donna)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, absent opposition and for good cause shown. Accordingly, Defendant must file a responsive pleading to the complaint on or before April 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on February 27, 2020. (Marienko, A.)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Defendant Westover School's Motion for Extension of Time, absent opposition and for good cause shown. Accordingly, the parties must conduct their Rule 26(f) planning conference on or before March 19, 2020. The parties must file their joint Rule 26(f) report on or before April 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on February 18, 2020. (Marienko, A.)
February 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2020 To File Responsive Pleading (With Consent) by Westover School, Inc.. (Dolan, John)
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 20, 2019 To Conduct 26(f) Planning Conference and to File 26(f) Report (With Consent) by Westover School, Inc.. (Dolan, John)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Dolan on behalf of Westover School, Inc. (Dolan, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Westover School, Inc.. (McNamara, Claire)
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Miranda. Westover School, Inc. served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Ponvert, Antonio)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, absent opposition and for good cause shown. Therefore, Defendant must answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on February 18, 2020. (Marienko, A.)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time until March 3, 2020 to respond to Complaint by Westover School, Inc.. (McNamara, Claire)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M McNamara on behalf of Westover School, Inc. (McNamara, Claire)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance Attorney Gary C. Kaisen. by Westover School, Inc.. (Kaisen, Gary) Modified on 2/5/2020 (Nuzzi, Tiffany).
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Westover School, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Antonio Ponvert, III* *Koskoff, Koskoff & Bieder, P.C* *350 Fairfield Ave., 5th Floor* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Emily Miranda Signed by Clerk on 1/28/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 1/28/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2020 Discovery due by 7/29/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 9/2/2020 Signed by Clerk on 1/28/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 28, 2020 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 28, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Westover School, Inc.. (Ponvert, Antonio)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Westover School, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5660580.), filed by Emily Miranda.(Ponvert, Antonio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miranda v. Westover School, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Miranda
Represented By: Antonio Ponvert, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westover School, Inc.
Represented By: Claire M McNamara
Represented By: Gary Charles Kaisen
Represented By: John G. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?