Lenti v. Connecticut et al
Petitioner: John Lenti
Respondent: Colleen Gallagher, Kenneth Buttricks, State of Connecticut, David Maiga and Rollin Cook
Case Number: 3:2020cv00127
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 21 OBJECTION re #10 MOTION to speed case up, #1 Complaint, #15 MOTION for for Order filed by Rollin Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donohue, James)
March 16, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Donohue on behalf of Rollin Cook in his Official Capacity (Donohue, James)
March 16, 2020 Filing 19 Letter from John Lenti Dated 3/12/2020 Re: Prison Conditions (Oliver, T.)
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Kenneth Buttricks, Rollin Cook, Colleen Gallagher, David Maiga* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Lenti #224034* *CHESHIRE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION* *900 Highland Avenue* *Cheshire, CT 06410*. (Oliver, T.)
March 10, 2020 Filing 17 Letter from John Lenti Dated 3/9/2020 Re: Medical Condition (Oliver, T.)
March 10, 2020 USM 285 forms together with Summons, Complaint, Doc #10, #15, #16, copy of the Administrative Directive, Order granting IFP reviewed and sent to USM for service on defendant(s). Marshals Return of Service on Summons due by 3/30/2020 (Oliver, T.)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing service of process on the defendants in this case. The clerk shall first verify the current work addresses for Rollin Cook, Kenneth Buttricks, Colleen Gallagher, and David Maiga (the Defendants) with the DOC Office of Legal Affairs. The clerk shall then make arrangements for in-person service by the U.S. Marshals Service on the Defendants, at their confirmed addresses. Service of process in this case shall include (1) the complaint, doc. no. 1, (2) Lenti's first "emergency motion," doc. no. 10, and (3) Lenti's second "emergency motion," doc. no. 15. Service shall be effected within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. The clerk shall mail a courtesy copy of the complaint, Lenti's two "emergency motions," and this Order to the DOC Office of Legal Affairs. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/05/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 EMERGANCY MOTION for Order by John Lenti. (Oliver, T.)
March 3, 2020 Filing 14 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by John Lenti. (Oliver, T.)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 2/28/20. (Payton, R.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 13 EXHIBITS by John Lenti re #1 Complaint. (Payton, R.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by John Lenti. (Payton, R.)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 EMERGENCY MOTION to speed case up by John Lenti.Responses due by 3/16/2020 (Payton, R.)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #7 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 3/16/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 2/24/20.(Payton, R.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Medical by John Lenti (Oliver, T.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Lenti. (Payton, R.)
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 2/20/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 1/30/2020.(Payton, R.)
January 30, 2020 Docket Entry Correction re #1 Complaint. Modified to correct file date to 1/23/2020. (Bozek, M.)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/23/2020.(Bozek, M.)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/23/2020.(Bozek, M.)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/23/2020.(Bozek, M.)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John Lenti. (Bozek, M.)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Kenneth Buttricks, State of Connecticut, Rollin Cook, Colleen Gallagher, David Maiga, filed by John Lenti. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(Bozek, M.) Modified on 1/29/2020 to correct file date (Bozek, M.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenti v. Connecticut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colleen Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth Buttricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Maiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rollin Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Lenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?