Zanavich v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elaine Zanavich
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00160
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal of CASE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Simpson, Robert)
March 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren R. Greenspoon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Greenspoon, Lauren)
March 9, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by Johnson & Johnson.(Simpson, Robert)
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by Ethicon, Inc..(Simpson, Robert)
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Reginald Simpson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Simpson, Robert)
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Zanavich. Johnson & Johnson served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Lizik, Dana)
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Zanavich. Ethicon, Inc. served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Lizik, Dana)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Dana Lizik to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number BCTDC-5701058) by Elaine Zanavich. (Lizik, Dana)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Lizik on behalf of Elaine Zanavich (Lizik, Dana)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear for Attorney Dana Lizik to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/20/2020. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Dana Lizik to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number BCTDC-5701058) by Elaine Zanavich. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Moskow, Neal)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Johnson & Johnson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ethicon, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Elaine Zanavich, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 2/4/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/4/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/4/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2020, Discovery due by 8/5/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2020. Signed by Clerk on 2/4/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BCTDC-5672902.), filed by Elaine Zanavich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moskow, Neal)
February 4, 2020 ENTERED IN ERROR Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Elaine Zanavich. (Moskow, Neal) Modified on 2/4/2020 to edit text(Walker, J.).
February 4, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ethicon Inc.. (Moskow, Neal)
February 4, 2020 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)
February 4, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Johnson & Johnson. (Moskow, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zanavich v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Zanavich
Represented By: Neal Lewis Moskow
Represented By: Dana Lizik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Lauren R. Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Lauren R. Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?