Rager et al v. CBS Corp. et al
Plaintiff: William Rager and Dorothy Rager
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC, Elliott Company, CBS Corp., General Electric Company, Crane Co., Electro Dynamic Corporation and CBS Corp
Case Number: 3:2020cv00165
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #6 motion for joinder; granting #7 motion for joinder; granting #11 motion to amend/correct; granting #12 motion to amend/correct. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 03/26/20. (Covello, Alfred)
March 17, 2020 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mohan, Catherine)
March 9, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik C. DiMarco on behalf of Electro Dynamic Corporation (DiMarco, Erik)
March 9, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electro Dynamic Corporation. (DiMarco, Erik)
March 9, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Electro Dynamic Corporation.(DiMarco, Erik)
March 3, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher Collings to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5681016) by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 26, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
February 19, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elliott Company identifying Corporate Parent Ebara Corporation, Other Affiliate Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliott Company. (D'Agostino, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Elliott Company.(D'Agostino, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of Elliott Company (D'Agostino, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of Elliott Company (George, Wayne)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Collings. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/10/2020. Signed by Clerk on 02/10/2020. (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #14 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by General Electric Company, #13 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Notice (Other) filed by General Electric Company, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by General Electric Company, #7 MOTION for Joinder filed by Dorothy Rager, William Rager, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by General Electric Company, #3 Notice (Other), filed by General Electric Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Electric Company, #6 MOTION for Joinder filed by Dorothy Rager, William Rager, #9 Answer to Complaint filed by CBS Corp. Signed by Clerk on 02/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher Collings to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5681016) by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Christopher Collings))(Mohan, Catherine)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 02/05/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/5/2020. Discovery due by 8/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Clerk on 02/05/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Cite in Party Defendant by Dorothy Rager, William Rager. Responses due by 2/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Second Amended Complaint)(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Cite in Party Defendant by Dorothy Rager, William Rager. Responses due by 2/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint)(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Special Defenses with Jury Demand by CBS Corp.(Anastasio, F.)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by General Electric Company Notice Pursuant to Standing Order On Removed Cases (Mohan, Catherine)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder by Dorothy Rager, William Rager. (Anastasio, F.)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Joinder by Dorothy Rager, William Rager. (Anastasio, F.)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company (Sheldon, Tara)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by General Electric Company Notice of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B Motion to Cite and First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Motion to Cite and Second Amended Complaint)(Mohan, Catherine)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Electric Company from Superior Court Judicial District of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number ASB-FBT-CT-19-6092924-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5676415, filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (served summons & complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Court Record, #3 Exhibit C (Notice to State Court))(Mohan, Catherine)
February 5, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rager et al v. CBS Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Mark O. Denehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp.
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electro Dynamic Corporation
Represented By: Erik C. DiMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rager
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Rager
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?