Colony Grill Development, LLC et al v. Colony Grill, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: FAIRFIELD COLONY, LLC and Colony Grill Development, LLC
Defendant: COLONY GRILL OF STAMFORD, LLC and COLONY GRILL, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00213
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Colony Grill, Inc. to 4/29/2020; Colony Grill of Stamford, LLC to 4/29/2020. (Ferguson, L.)
April 7, 2020 Docket Entry Correction re Revised Second MOTION for Extension of Time until April 29, 2020 to Respond to the Complaint (ECF No. #30 ): modified to include additional filer Colony Grill of Stamford, LLC. (Ferguson, L.)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (ECF No. #29 ) is hereby DENIED as moot. See ECF No. 31. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/7/2020. (Brambila, N.)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Revised Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (ECF No. #30 ) is hereby GRANTED up to and including April 29, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/7/2020. (Brambila, N.)
April 6, 2020 Filing 30 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until April 29, 2020 (Revised) to Respond to the Complaint by Colony Grill, Inc. and Colony Grill of Stamford, LLC. (Horvack, John) Modified on 4/7/2020 to include additional filer (Ferguson, L.).
April 3, 2020 Filing 29 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until April 29, 2020 to Respond to the Complaint by Colony Grill, Inc.. (Horvack, John)
March 6, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Victoria R. Danta to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5732410) by Colony Grill Development, LLC, Fairfield Colony, LLC. (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #20 MOTION for Attorney(s) David J. Wolfsohn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5732403) by Colony Grill Development, LLC, Fairfield Colony, LLC. (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicole K. McLaughlin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5732373) by Colony Grill Development, LLC, Fairfield Colony, LLC. (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear for Attorney Victoria R. Danta to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear for Attorney David J. Wolfsohn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear for Attorney Nicole K. McLaughlin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
March 5, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Colony Grill of Stamford, LLC to 4/9/2020; Colony Grill, Inc. to 4/9/2020. (Ferguson, L.)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (ECF No. #17 ) is hereby GRANTED up to and including April 9, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/5/2020. (Brambila, N.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Victoria R. Danta to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5732410) by Colony Grill Development, LLC, Fairfield Colony, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Victoria R. Danta, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lacombe, Elizabeth)
March 5, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) David J. Wolfsohn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5732403) by Colony Grill Development, LLC, Fairfield Colony, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of David J. Wolfsohn, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lacombe, Elizabeth)
March 5, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicole K. McLaughlin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5732373) by Colony Grill Development, LLC, Fairfield Colony, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Nicole K. McLaughlin, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lacombe, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colony Grill, Inc.. (Horvack, John)
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until April 9, 2020 to Respond to the Complaint by Colony Grill, Inc.. (Horvack, John)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Horvack, Jr on behalf of Colony Grill, Inc. (Horvack, John)
March 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Cicchetti on behalf of Colony Grill of Stamford, LLC (Cicchetti, Michael)
March 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Tansley on behalf of Colony Grill of Stamford, LLC (Tansley, Michael)
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colony Grill Development, LLC, Fairfield Colony, LLC. Colony Grill of Stamford, LLC served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colony Grill Development, LLC, Fairfield Colony, LLC. Colony Grill, Inc. served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Colony Grill of Stamford, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Elizabeth M Lacombe* *Duane Morris LLP - Htfd, CT* *100 Pearl St., Suite 1415* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Colony Grill, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Elizabeth M Lacombe* *Duane Morris LLP - Htfd, CT* *100 Pearl St., Suite 1415* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 14, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Colony Grill of Stamford, LLC. (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Colony Grill, Inc.. (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Trademark Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Agati, Kathryn)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Colony Grill of Stamford, LLC, Colony Grill, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Elizabeth M Lacombe* *Duane Morris LLP - Htfd, CT* *100 Pearl St., Suite 1415* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Colony Grill Development, LLC, Fairfield Colony, LLC, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Colony Grill Development, LLC, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Fairfield Colony, LLC. Signed by Clerk on 2/14/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/13/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/13/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/13/2020, Discovery due by 8/14/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 9/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 13, 2020 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FAIRFIELD COLONY, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Colony Grill Development, LLC for FAIRFIELD COLONY, LLC. (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colony Grill Development, LLC. (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to COLONY GRILL OF STAMFORD, LLC, COLONY GRILL, INC.. (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COLONY GRILL, INC., COLONY GRILL OF STAMFORD, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5695692.), filed by Colony Grill Development, LLC, FAIRFIELD COLONY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lacombe, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colony Grill Development, LLC et al v. Colony Grill, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLONY GRILL OF STAMFORD, LLC
Represented By: Michael H. Cicchetti
Represented By: Michael G. Tansley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLONY GRILL, INC.
Represented By: John R. Horvack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAIRFIELD COLONY, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth M Lacombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colony Grill Development, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth M Lacombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?