Mason v. Besse et al
Plaintiff: Allen Kenneth Mason
Defendant: Besse, Meikle, Krodel, Cannata, Rykowski, Dupointe and Rankin
Case Number: 3:2020cv00246
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at anytime during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 3/10/20. (Payton, R.)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Allen Kenneth Mason. (Fanelle, N.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 3/18/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 2/27/20.(Payton, R.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 Docket Entry Correction re 7 ENTERED IN ERROR Order granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, (Payton, R.) Modified on 2/27/2020 (Payton, R.).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR- ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 2/21/2020. (Payton, R.) Modified on 2/27/2020 (Payton, R.).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order on Prisoner E-Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 02/21/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 02/21/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/21/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/21/2020 Discovery due by 8/22/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 9/26/2020 Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified on 2/24/2020 (Nuzzi, Tiffany).
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Allen Kenneth Mason. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified on 2/24/2020 added priscs (Nuzzi, Tiffany).
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS COMPLAINT against Besse, Cannata, Dupointe, Krodel, Meikle, Rankin, Rykowski, filed by Allen Kenneth Mason. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified on 2/24/2020 added priscs(Nuzzi, Tiffany).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Besse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Besse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meikle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krodel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupointe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Kenneth Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?