Conley v. 1008 Bank Street, LLC
Plaintiff: Billie Conley, Jr.
Defendant: 1008 Bank Street, LLC and 1008 Bank Street, LLC doing business as Riverside Auto II
Case Number: 3:2020cv00284
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Motion for default judgment due by 5/16/2020. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Signed by Clerk on 04/16/20. (Barry, Donna)
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) failure to plead as to 1008 Bank Street, LLC by Billie Conley, Jr. (Mahoney, Brendan)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Lorenz Mahoney on behalf of Billie Conley, Jr (Mahoney, Brendan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billie Conley, Jr. 1008 Bank Street, LLC served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Blinn, Daniel)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *1008 Bank Street, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL : Counsel initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Billie Conley, Jr., #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 3/2/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 3/2/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2020 Discovery due by 9/1/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 10/6/2020 Signed by Clerk on 3/2/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1008 Bank Street, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5724832.), filed by Billie Conley, Jr.(Blinn, Daniel)
March 2, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 1008 Bank Street, LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)
March 2, 2020 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conley v. 1008 Bank Street, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Conley, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Represented By: Brendan Lorenz Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1008 Bank Street, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1008 Bank Street, LLC doing business as Riverside Auto II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?