Soares et al v. Williams
Plaintiff: Dennis Soares and Limon Wilkes
Defendant: Jerry Williams
Case Number: 3:2020cv00291
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jerry Williams* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Dennis Soares* *83 Quirk Road* *Milford, CT 06460*. (Fanelle, N.)
March 18, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Jerry Williams. (Fanelle, N.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Fazekas, J.)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Dennis Soares Signed by Clerk on 03/04/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/02/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/02/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2020. Discovery due by 9/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/6/2020. Signed by Clerk on 03/02/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 2, 2020 Filing fee received from Dennis Soares: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00011016. (Fazekas, J.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jerry Williams, filed by Dennis Soares.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soares et al v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Soares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limon Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?