Tyson v. Juliet
Plaintiff: Terrance Tyson
Defendant: Juliet
Case Number: 3:2020cv00296
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 3/11/20. (Payton, R.)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrance Tyson. (Payton, R.)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency. You must submit the filing fee of $400.00 or the attached Prisoner's IFP application which is being sent to you via U.S. mail.If insufficiency is not corrected Dismissal due by 3/27/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 3/6/20.(Payton, R.)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 03/03/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/03/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/03/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Juliet, filed by Terrance Tyson.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyson v. Juliet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?