Griffin v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: James L. Griffin
Defendant: Roland Cook, Cynthia Nadeau, Michael Desena and Micheal Desena
Case Number: 3:2020cv00307
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as moot in light of Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Void his Complaint, the Court's Dkt. 8 grant thereof, and the Court's Dkt. 9 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/17/2020. (Nault, James)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and without costs or fees to either party in light of Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Void his Complaint as mistakenly filed and the Court's Dkt. 8 grant thereof. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/17/2020. (Nault, James)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw in light of Plaintiff's assertion that his Complaint was mistakenly filed. The Court will enter a separate order dismissing this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/17/2020. (Nault, James)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw Void #1 Complaint by James L. Griffin. (Payton, R.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James L. Griffin. (Payton, R.)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency. You must submit the filing fee of $400.00 or the attached Prisoner's IFP application which is being sent to you Via. U.S. mail. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 3/31/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 3/10/20.(Payton, R.) Modified on 3/10/2020 (Payton, R.)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/6/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/6/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/6/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 PRISC -- COMPLAINT against Roland Cook, Michael Desena, Cynthia Nadeau, filed by James L. Griffin. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-G, #3 Exhibit H-R). (Velez, F.) Modified on 3/9/2020 to add PRISC (Velez, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Desena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Desena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?