Bathija et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jyoti Bathija and Jagdish T. Bathija
Defendant: Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00308
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 5/14/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/15/2020 04:15 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is 888.636.3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650.8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Rosenberg, J.)
May 1, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/14/2020 04:15 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is 888.636.3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650.8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Rosenberg, J.)
May 1, 2020 Filing 74 RESPONSE re #68 MOTION to Preclude (3619) the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev (Wave 4) (7045) filed by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija. (Palmer, Tracie)
April 29, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION to Preclude (2205) or Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Maclean, Ph.D. by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija.Responses due by 5/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (2205) Part 2, #2 Exhibit (2205) Part 3, #3 Exhibit (2206) Plaintiffs Memo ISO MTE or Limit Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., #4 Exhibit (2287) Defendants Response to MTE MacLean, #5 Exhibit (2287) Part 2, #6 Exhibit (2297) Plaintiffs Reply re MacLean, #7 Exhibit (2552) Defendants Response to MTE MacLean, #8 Exhibit (2552) Part 2, #9 Exhibit (2552) Part 3, #10 Exhibit (2825) Plaintiffs MTE or Limit MacLean, #11 Exhibit (2826) Plaintiffs Memo, #12 Exhibit (2942) Defendants Response to MTE MacLean, #13 Exhibit (3053) Plaintiffs Reply ISO MTE MacLean, #14 Exhibit (6824) Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption of Daubert Motion re MacLean for Wave 8, #15 Exhibit (6998) Defendants Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re MacLean for Wave 8, #16 Exhibit (7100) Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption of Reply re MacLean for Wave 8)(Palmer, Tracie)
April 29, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Preclude (1986) Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Thomas C. Wright, Jr., M.D.(Responses due by 5/20/2020, ) by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (1988) Plaintiffs Amended Memo ISO MTE Thomas C. Wright, Jr., M.D., #2 Exhibit (2143) Defendants Response to Amended MTE re Wright, #3 Exhibit (3844) Plaintiffs Reply to Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Wright for Wave 4, #4 Exhibit (6864) Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Wright for Wave 8, #5 Exhibit (6973) Defendants Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Wright for Wave 8, #6 Exhibit (7119) Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption of Daubert Reply re Wright for Wave 8)(Palmer, Tracie)
April 29, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION to Preclude (2060) Options of FDA Expert Timothy Ulatowski by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija.Responses due by 5/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (2065) Plaintiffs MOL ISO MTE Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit (2134) Defendants Response to MTE Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit (2232) Plaintiffs Reply, #4 Exhibit (2910) Defendants Supp Response and Notice of Adoption of Daubert Reponse re Ulatowski for Wave 3, #5 Exhibit (6860) Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Ulatowski for Wave 8, #6 Exhibit (6965) Defendants Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Ulatowski for Wave 8, #7 Exhibit (7143) Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply re Ulatowski for Wave 8)(Palmer, Tracie)
April 29, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Preclude (3658) Certain Opinions and Testimony of Ted Roth, M.D. by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija.Responses due by 5/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (3668) Plaintiffs Memo ISO MTE Ted Roth, MD, #2 Exhibit (3755) Defendants Opposition to MTE Roth, #3 Exhibit (3857) Plaintiffs Reply ISO MTE Roth, #4 Exhibit (6845) Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Roth for Wave 8, #5 Exhibit (7039) Defendants Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Roth for Wave 8, #6 Exhibit (7108) Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply re Roth)(Palmer, Tracie)
April 28, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION to Preclude (2759) Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, Ph.D. (Wave 3) by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson.Responses due by 5/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude P. Pence (Wave 3), #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition ot Motion to Exclude P. Pence (Wave 3), #3 Exhibit Defs Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude P. Pence (Wave 3), #4 Exhibit Defs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion to Exclude P. Pence for Wave 8, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of P. Pence for Wave 8, #6 Exhibit Defs Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude P. Pence for Wave 8)(Simpson, Robert)
April 28, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION to Preclude (3619) the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev (Wave 4) by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson.Responses due by 5/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1] Defs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 4) - Part 2., #2 Exhibit Defs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 4) - Part 3, #3 Exhibit Defs Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 4), #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs Response to Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 4) - Part 1, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs Response to Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 4) - Part 2, #6 Exhibit Plaintiffs Response to Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 4) - Part 3, #7 Exhibit Defs Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 4), #8 Exhibit Defs Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 8) - Part 1, #9 Exhibit Defs Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 8) - Part 2, #10 Exhibit Defs Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 8) - Part 3, #11 Exhibit Defs Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 8), #12 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Adoption of Prior Daubert Response and Opposition to Motion to Exclude Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 8), #13 Exhibit Plaintiffs Amended Adoption of Prior Daubert Response and Opposition of Motion to Exclude Dr. Iakovlev (Wave 8), #14 Exhibit Defs Reply in Further Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D. (Wave 8))(Simpson, Robert)
April 28, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to Preclude (3626) and Motion to Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson.Responses due by 5/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs Motion to Limit Testimony of Prof Dr Med Uwe Klinge (Wave 4) - Part 2, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Opposition to Defs Motion to Exclude Testimony of Prof Dr Med Uwe Klinge (Wave 4) - Part 1, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs Opposition to Defs Motion to Exclude Testimony of Prof Dr Med Uwe Klinge (Wave 4) - Part 2, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs Opposition to Defs Motion to Exclude Testimony of Prof Dr Med Uwe Klinge (Wave 4) - Part 3, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs Opposition to Defs Motion to Exclude Testimony of Prof Dr Med Uwe Klinge (Wave 4) - Part 4, #6 Exhibit Defs Memorandum in Support of Motion to Limit Testimony of Prof Dr Med Uwe Klinge (Wave 4), #7 Exhibit Defs Reply in Support Motion to Limit the Testimony of Prof Dr Med Uwe Klinge (Wave 4), #8 Exhibit Defs Notice of Adoption of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Prof Dr Med Uwe Klinge (Wave 8), #9 Exhibit Defs Amended Notice of Adoption of Motion to Exclude Prof Dr Med Uwe Kling filed in Wave 4 (Wave 8), #10 Exhibit Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Prof Dr Med Klinge for Wave 8, #11 Exhibit Defs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply Regarding Prof Dr Med Uwe Klinge for Wave 8)(Simpson, Robert)
April 28, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION to Preclude (2082) Certain General Opinions of Daniel Elliott, M.D. by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson.Responses due by 5/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Def's Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of D. Elliott (Wave 1) - Part 2, #2 Exhibit Def's Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of D. Elliott (Wave 1) - Part 3, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs Amended Memorandum in Opposition to Defs Motion to Exclude D. Elliott (Wave 1), #4 Exhibit Def's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of D. Elliott (Wave 3), #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defs Motion to Exclude Opinions of D. Elliott (Wave 3), #6 Exhibit Def's Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of D. Elliott (Wave 7) - Part 1, #7 Exhibit Def's Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of D. Elliott (Wave 7) - Part 2, #8 Exhibit Def's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of D. Elliott (Wave 7), #9 Exhibit Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defs Motion to Exclude D. Elliott (Wave 7), #10 Exhibit Defs Notice of Adoption of Prior Dauber Motion to Exclude D. Elliott for Wave 8, #11 Exhibit Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of D. Elliott for Wave 8)(Simpson, Robert)
April 28, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION to Preclude (2029) Certain Opinions of Michael Thomas Margolis, M.D. (Wave 1) by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson.Responses due by 5/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of M. Margolis (Wave 1), #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of M. Margolis (Wave 1), #3 Exhibit Defs Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of M. Margolis (Wave 1), #4 Exhibit Defs Suppl. Motion to Exclude and Notice of Adoption of Prior Motion and Reply of M. Margolis for Wave 3, #5 Exhibit Defs Memorandum in Support of Supplemental Motion to Exclude and Adopt Motion and Reply of M. Margolis for Wave 3, #6 Exhibit Plaintiffs Opposition to Supplemental Motion to Exclude and Notice of Adoption of Prior Opposition Regarding M. Margolis (Wave 3), #7 Exhibit Defs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motions and Reply as to M. Margolis for Wave 8, #8 Exhibit Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of M. Margolis for Wave 8)(Simpson, Robert)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM and ORDER of Status Conference. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2020, Answer due by 5/26/2020, Discovery due by 9/5/2020). Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/22/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
April 22, 2020 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/22/2020. Total Time: 0 hours and 21 minutes. (Rosenberg, J.)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Attorney Maha M. Kabbash to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/20/2020. (Oliver, T.)
April 17, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Maha M. Kabbash to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5809267) by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Maha M. Kabbash)(Gooley, Brendan)
April 17, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Gooley on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Gooley, Brendan)
April 15, 2020 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #53 MOTION for Attorney(s) TRACIE L. PALMER to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5787882) by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija. (Palmer, Tracie)
April 8, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/22/2020 at 10:15 AM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is 888.636.3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650.8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Rosenberg, J.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracie Palmer on behalf of Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija (Palmer, Tracie)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Attorney(s)Tracie L. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/6/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/7/2020. (Oliver, T.)
April 6, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Balefsky on behalf of Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija (Balefsky, Lee)
April 6, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A Gomez on behalf of Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija (Gomez, Christopher)
April 6, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Attorney(s) TRACIE L. PALMER to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5787882) by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Bernard, David)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Attorney Lee B. Balefsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/6/2020. (Oliver, T.)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Attorney Christopher A. Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/6/2020. (Oliver, T.)
April 3, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lee B. Balefsky to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5785612) by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Bernard, David)
April 3, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher A. Gomez to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5785602) by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Bernard, David)
April 3, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Bernard on behalf of Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija (Bernard, David)
March 24, 2020 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Greenspoon, Lauren)
March 11, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren R. Greenspoon on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Greenspoon, Lauren)
March 11, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Reginald Simpson on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Simpson, Robert)
March 9, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE TO COUNSEL IN TRANSFERRED CASE Signed by Clerk on 03/09/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Fazekas, J.).
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/06/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/06/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2020. Discovery due by 9/5/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/10/2020. Signed by Clerk on 03/06/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 6, 2020 Filing 38 Case electronically transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-00080. Modified on 3/9/2020 to correct file date(Walker, J.).
March 6, 2020 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Walker, J.)
February 28, 2020 Filing 37 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (6824) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (6998) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (7100) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 2/28/2020 to add party filers) (slr).
February 28, 2020 Filing 36 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1986) - Pls' Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1988) - Pls' Amended Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2143) - Defs Resp to Pls' Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3844) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6864) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6973) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7119) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 2/28/2020 to add party filers) (slr).
February 28, 2020 Filing 35 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) - Defs' Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6860) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 2/28/2020 to add party filers)(slr).
February 28, 2020 Filing 34 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3658) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Ted Roth.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3668) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Ted Roth.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3755) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Ted Roth.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3857) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Ted Roth.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6845) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Ted Roth.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7039) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Ted Roth.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7108) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Ted Roth.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 2/28/2020 to add party filers)(slr).
February 28, 2020 Filing 33 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6821) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6958) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7177) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 2/28/2020 to add party filers) (slr).
February 28, 2020 Filing 32 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3619) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3621) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6875) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7038) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (7045) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7085) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (7183) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 2/28/2020 to add party filers)(slr).
February 28, 2020 Filing 31 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6648) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6833) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6926) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7123) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 2/28/2020 to add party filers) (slr).
February 28, 2020 Filing 30 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2082) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2082) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2082) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2191) - Pls' Amended Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2815) - Defs' Mem in Support of Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2952) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (5339) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (5339) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (5340) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (5491) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6842) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6922) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 2/28/2020 to add party filers) (slr).
February 28, 2020 Filing 29 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #28 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2029) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2031) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2169) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2212) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2832) - Defs' Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2833) - Defs' Mem in Support of Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2904) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6868) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6953) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 2/28/2020 to add party filers)(slr).
February 28, 2020 Filing 28 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 2/28/2020 to add party filers)(slr).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 03/06/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 03/05/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 02/21/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms)
April 24, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Letter)(Gage, William)
April 23, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija (Balefsky, Lee)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI)
October 31, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #19 Response In Opposition,. (Robinson, Susan)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI)
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija in opposition to #17 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee)
October 24, 2018 Filing 19 OPPOSITION by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija to #17 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Balefsky, Lee)
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #17 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Robinson, Susan)
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A - B)(Robinson, Susan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITIONS OF FRIENDS AND FAMILY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bindu Bajaj, Chandni A. Thawani, Jagdish Bathija, Amit A. Thawani, and Samantha U. Bathija on dates and at times to Be determined. (Robinson, Susan)
August 15, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William)
August 2, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija of Brian J. Hines, MD on 08/16/2018 at 1:00 P.M. (Balefsky, Lee)
July 30, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija for Supplemental Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production (Set I). (Balefsky, Lee)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (mek) (ADI)
May 18, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Robinson, Susan)
March 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Jyoti Bathija on April 6, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Merk, Melissa)
February 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lee B. Balefsky on behalf of Lisa Dagostino for Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija. (Balefsky, Lee)
January 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Brian J. Hines on 3/29/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Combs, Philip)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mmw)
September 25, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari)
June 6, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Jagdish T. Bathija, Jyoti Bathija. (Balefsky, Lee)
February 19, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy)
February 13, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David)
January 6, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 160 (Order Scheduling Meetings in MDLs on January 29-30, 2015) entered on 12/18/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw)
January 5, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3603844. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bathija et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jyoti Bathija
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Represented By: David M. Bernard
Represented By: Tracie Palmer
Represented By: Lee Balefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jagdish T. Bathija
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Represented By: David M. Bernard
Represented By: Tracie Palmer
Represented By: Lee Balefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Brendan Gooley
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Lauren R. Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Brendan Gooley
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Lauren R. Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?