Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2020cv00313
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *John Doe* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jacqueline M. James* *The James Law Firm PPLC* *445 Hamilton Avenue, Suite 1102* *White Plains, NY 10601*. (Peterson, M)
April 28, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to John Doe. (Peterson, M)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 Sealed Document: UN REDACTED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(James, Jacqueline)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The plaintiff's #8 motion for leave to file its complaint, summons, and return of service under seal is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file unredacted versions of those documents under seal. As the Court has noted in other cases brought by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, this case is one of over one hundred cases brought in this District since 2017 by the plaintiff against a "John Doe" defendant identified by his or her Internet Protocol ("IP") address. These cases follow a similar pattern, typically ending in a notice of voluntary dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) such that the merits of the claim are not litigated. Courts around the nation have also expressed increasing concerns that, given the nature of the films at issue, defendants may feel coerced to settle these suits merely to prevent public disclosure of their identifying information, even if they believe they have been misidentified. See, e.g., Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe, No. 2:18-cv-00824-CB, 2018 WL 3688415, at *1 n.2 (W.D. Pa. Aug. 3, 2018); Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe, No. 18-cv-2648-VEC, 2019 WL 78987, at *4 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 2, 2019); Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe, No. 1:18-cv-2205-RC-GMH, 2018 WL 5297816, at *2 (D.D.C. Oct. 25, 2018); Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe, 351 F. Supp. 3d 160, 162 (D.D.C. 2018). In light of these concerns, I find it necessary to impose additional conditions to protect the defendant's privacy and prevent coercive settlement practices: 1. Plaintiff may only use the defendant's name and address for the purposes of this litigation. Plaintiff is ordered not to disclose the defendant's name or address, or any other identifying information other than defendant's IP address. Plaintiff shall not threaten to disclose any of the defendants identifying information. 2. Defendant will be permitted to litigate this case anonymously unless and until the Court orders otherwise. The Court will not require the defendant to proceed under his or her own name without providing the defendant an opportunity to challenge the disclosure of his or her identity, including an opportunity to challenge the technology used to identify defendant's IP address. Therefore, plaintiff is ordered not to publicly file any of defendant's identifying information and to file all documents containing defendant's identifying information under seal, and to file redacted versions of those documents omitting such identifying information on the public docket. 3. Plaintiff shall file on the docket, under seal, the terms of any settlement agreement with defendant John Doe. Should plaintiff choose to dismiss this case for reasons other than settlement, it shall file a statement so indicating and identifying those reasons on the docket. Failure to comply with this or any of the foregoing conditions will result in sanctions. Even after dismissal, the Court will retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing this order. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/21/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Complaint, Proposed Summons and Return of Service Under Seal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachments) (Peterson, M)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #5 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 03/10/2020. (Peterson, M)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 03/09/2020. (Peterson, M)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 03/09/2020. (Peterson, M)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/8/2020. Discovery due by 9/8/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Clerk on 03/09/2020. (Peterson, M)
March 9, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (James, Jacqueline)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5738513.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?