Colella v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp
Plaintiff: Sheila Colella
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp
Case Number: 3:2020cv00367
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Dlugoszewski on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp (Dlugoszewski, Sarah)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Kean Ostrowski on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp (Ostrowski, Mark)
April 10, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/25/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.(Drury, Christopher)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Finance Corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Holding, AC, Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Drury, Christopher)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Drury on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp (Drury, Christopher)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheila Colella. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp served on 3/20/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. (Virgulto, Thomas)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas A. Virgulto* *Hill & Hill, LLC* *2E Samson Rock Drive, Meigswood* *Madison, CT 06443*. (Freberg, B)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Sheila Colella, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/17/2020.(Freberg, B)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/17/2020.(Freberg, B)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/17/2020.(Freberg, B)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/16/2020; Discovery due by 9/16/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/17/2020.(Freberg, B)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp (Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5754733.), filed by Sheila Colella. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anastasio, F.)
March 17, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 17, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Virgulto, Thomas)
March 17, 2020 ENTERED IN ERROR - Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Sheila Colella. (Virgulto, Thomas) Modified to enter in error per attorney on 3/18/2020 (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colella v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp
Represented By: Sarah E. Dlugoszewski
Represented By: Christopher R. Drury
Represented By: Mark Kean Ostrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Colella
Represented By: Thomas A. Virgulto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?