Rivera v. Connecticut Children's Medical Center
Plaintiff: Alexis Rivera
Defendant: Connecticut Children's Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2020cv00369
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Farmer, Alexa)
April 24, 2020 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alexis Rivera. (Paradisi, Matthew)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Connecticut Children's Medical Center.(Farmer, Alexa)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Paradisi on behalf of Alexis Rivera (Paradisi, Matthew)
March 22, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Connecticut Children's Medical Center to 4/23/2020. (Barry, Donna)
March 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Defendant Connecticut Children's Medical Center's Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, Defendant must file its response to the Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 22, 2020. (Dorais, L.)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 23, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Connecticut Children's Medical Center. (Farmer, Alexa)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL : Counsel initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Connecticut Children's Medical Center, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Connecticut Children's Medical Center, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Connecticut Children's Medical Center, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Connecticut Children's Medical Center, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Connecticut Children's Medical Center, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Connecticut Children's Medical Center Signed by Clerk on 03/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret J. Strange on behalf of Connecticut Children's Medical Center (Strange, Margaret)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 03/17/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/16/2020 Discovery due by 9/16/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2020 Signed by Clerk on 3/17/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 17, 2020 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Connecticut Children's Medical Center re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Statement Regarding Removal (Farmer, Alexa)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Connecticut Children's Medical Center re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Notice of Pending Motions (Farmer, Alexa)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Connecticut Children's Medical Center re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing and Service of Petition for Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farmer, Alexa)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa M. Farmer on behalf of Connecticut Children's Medical Center (Farmer, Alexa)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Connecticut Children's Medical Center from Hartford Superior, case number HHD-CV20-6124553-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5755223, filed by Connecticut Children's Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farmer, Alexa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Connecticut Children's Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Children's Medical Center
Represented By: Alexa M. Farmer
Represented By: Margaret J. Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Rivera
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Represented By: Matthew D. Paradisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?