Rodriguez v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Diane Rodriguez
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2020cv00371
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Park, Caroline)
April 9, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership.(Park, Caroline)
March 25, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership to 4/9/2020. (Johnson, D.)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The defendant's #13 motion for extension of time until April 9, 2020 to file a responsive pleading is GRANTED.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/25/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
March 24, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 9, 2020 To File a Responsive Pleading by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (Park, Caroline)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Jury Demand filed by Diane Rodriguez, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Diane Rodriguez, #11 Protective Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership Signed by Clerk on 03/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Peterson, M)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 03/18/2020. (Peterson, M)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 03/18/2020. (Peterson, M)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2020. Discovery due by 9/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2020. Signed by Clerk on 03/18/2020. (Peterson, M)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Diane Rodriguez (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Diane Rodriguez. (Paradisi, Matthew)
March 18, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline B Park on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership (Park, Caroline)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership of Pending Motions (Peikes, Lawrence)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Peikes, Lawrence)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership identifying Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (Peikes, Lawrence)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Peikes on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership (Peikes, Lawrence)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership from Superior Court of Connecticut, Waterbury Judicial District, case number UWY-CV20-6053615-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5756534, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Peikes, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Rodriguez
Represented By: Matthew D. Paradisi
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Lawrence Peikes
Represented By: Caroline B Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?