Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Coach USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Coach USA, LLC and Errol M. Edwin
Case Number: 3:2020cv00427
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Amend. Responses due by 5/22/2020. (Velez, F.)
May 1, 2020 Filing 20 Motion to Amend Summons and Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Bradley, Deborah) Responses due by 5/22/2020. Modified on 5/5/2020 to correct event to a Motion and modify docket text and added response deadline date (Velez, F.).
April 24, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Discovery status teleconference set for 1/13/2021 at 4:30 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. To participate in the teleconference, the parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Shafer, J.)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has evaluated the Parties' #17 Joint Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following case management deadlines. A discovery status teleconference will take place on 01/13/2021 at 4:30 PM. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 3/31/2021. Dispositive motions are due by 05/31/2021. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 08/01/2021, and jury selection will take place on 10/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 03/01/2022, and jury selection will take place on 04/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month after jury selection is scheduled to take place. The Parties are directed to closely follow #12 Chambers' Practices -- including the deadlines and format of filings -- when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the voir dire questions, jury instructions, and motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The Parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than 02 weeks before jury selection. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the Parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the Parties may jointly request such on the docket. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 04/24/2020. (Nault, James)
April 23, 2020 Filing 17 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bradley, Deborah)
April 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Seligman on behalf of Errol M. Edwin (Seligman, Steven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Errol M. Edwin to Consent to Removal (Sterling, Christian)
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian A. Sterling on behalf of Errol M. Edwin (Sterling, Christian)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice (Other) filed by Coach USA, LLC, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Coach USA, LLC, #11 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Coach USA, LLC, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Coach USA, LLC, #12 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Coach USA, LLC, #7 Notice (Other) filed by Coach USA, LLC, #5 Jury Demand filed by Coach USA, LLC, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Coach USA, LLC, #10 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 3/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Velez, F.)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/27/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/27/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/27/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2020; Discovery due by 9/26/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/27/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coach USA, LLC. (Vossler, Christopher)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Coach USA, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Notice to Counsel re Local Rule 5(b)) (Vossler, Christopher)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Coach USA, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Compliance With Standing Order In Removed Cases) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent to Removal)(Vossler, Christopher)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Coach USA, LLC. (Vossler, Christopher)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Vossler on behalf of Coach USA, LLC (Vossler, Christopher)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Coach USA, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Notice of Pending Motions) (Vossler, Christopher)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Coach USA, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (Superior Court))(Vossler, Christopher)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Coach USA, LLC from Hartford Superior Court, case number HD3 HHD CV 20 6125539S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5773342, filed by Coach USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint)(Vossler, Christopher)
March 27, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Coach USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Deborah L. Bradley
Represented By: Deborah Loomis Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coach USA, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Errol M. Edwin
Represented By: Christian A. Sterling
Represented By: Steven L. Seligman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?