Gebbie v. Morgan Stanley Co., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Gebbie
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Co., LLC, Donald Trump, Netflix.com, Disney and Amazon
Case Number: 3:2020cv00435
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Barry, Donna)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Gebbie has failed to file any opposition to the Motions to Dismiss within 21 days of my order directing him to do so. Accordingly, the case is dismissed without prejudice with regard to all defendants. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/15/2021. (Powell, G.)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Gebbie is directed to file any opposition to the Motions to Dismiss within 21 days of this order or this case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 01/26/2020. (Powell, G.)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/09/2020. (Powell, G.) Modified on 11/10/2020 (Jaiman, R.). MODIFIED TO INCLUDE THE DOCUMENT NUMBER.
September 17, 2020 Filing 43 SEALED MOTION "TO SEAL" the Sealed Motion On Behalf Of Defendant Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC To File Attached Unredacted Judicial Document Under Seal by Morgan Stanley Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Letter to be Sealed)(Machcinski, Victor)
June 1, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE by Amazon re #41 MOTION to Dismiss with Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for a more Definite Statement. to Pro Se Litigant Opposing Motion to Dismiss as required by local rule 12(a) (Magliery, John)
June 1, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss with Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for a more Definite Statement. by Amazon.Responses due by 6/22/2020 (Magliery, John)
June 1, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by Disney re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motions to Dismiss (Bertrand, Raymond)
June 1, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss by Disney.Responses due by 6/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Raymond W. Bertrand, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Raymond W. Bertrand, #4 Declaration of John McGowan)(Bertrand, Raymond)
June 1, 2020 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Disney. (Bertrand, Raymond)
May 29, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE by Netflix.com re #36 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #35 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P., 12(b)(6) To Pro Se Party Pursuant To D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 12(a), with copies of Fed. R. Civ. P 12 and D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7 (Fleischer, Robert)
May 29, 2020 Filing 36 Memorandum in Support re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P., 12(b)(6) filed by Netflix.com. (Fleischer, Robert)
May 29, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P., 12(b)(6) by Netflix.com.Responses due by 6/19/2020 (Fleischer, Robert)
May 28, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE by Donald Trump re #33 MOTION to Dismiss to Pro Se Litigant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FRCP 12, #2 Exhibit Local Rule 7)(Turbert, Julie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss by Donald Trump.Responses due by 6/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Turbert, Julie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ilene S. Farkas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5824613) by Netflix.com. (Farkas, Ilene)
May 6, 2020 Filing 31 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Award and in Support of Request for Dismissal, and re #29 MOTION to Amend/Correct case caption to substitute proper party filed by Morgan Stanley Co., LLC. (Machcinski, Victor)
May 6, 2020 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Victor A. Machcinski, Jr. in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Award Signed By Victor A. Machcinski, Jr. filed by Morgan Stanley Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gebbie Summons and Unverified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - FINRA Award Fully Executed Case No.18-00587, #3 Exhibit C - Gebbie FINRA SA and SOC, #4 Exhibit D - MS Answer to the SOC, #5 Exhibit E - FINRA Pre-Hearing Conference Scheduling Order, #6 Exhibit F - FINRA 04.16.2019 Cov. ltr. serving the Award, #7 Exhibit G - 10.03.2007 Welcome Book to Roth IRA - select pgs., #8 Exhibit H - 2008 Client Agreement revised)(Machcinski, Victor)
May 6, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Amend/Correct case caption to substitute proper party by Morgan Stanley Co., LLC.Responses due by 5/27/2020 (Machcinski, Victor)
April 29, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Ilene Susan Farkas, I on behalf of Netflix.com (Farkas, Ilene)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Attorney Ilene S. Farkas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/26/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/27/2020. (Oliver, T.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ilene S. Farkas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5824613) by Netflix.com. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ilene S. Farkas, Esq.)(Fleischer, Robert)
April 15, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 by Morgan Stanley Co., LLC. (Machcinski, Victor)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot #16 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/14/2020. (Smith, E)
April 14, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Netflix.com. (Fleischer, Robert)
April 14, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Amazon to 6/1/2020; Morgan Stanley Co., LLC to 5/7/2020; Netflix.com to 6/1/2020. (Jaiman, R.)
April 10, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon. (Magliery, John)
April 9, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2020 to respond to complaint #1 Notice of Removal by Amazon. (Magliery, John)
April 9, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Magliery on behalf of Amazon (Magliery, John)
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2020 To file a response to Plaitniff's pleading #16 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2020 Time to File Response to Plaitniff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal by Netflix.com. (Fleischer, Robert)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2020 to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/6/2020. (Smith, E)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2020 to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/6/2020. (Smith, E)
April 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2020 Time to File Response to Plaitniff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal by Netflix.com. (Fleischer, Robert)
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Fleischer on behalf of Netflix.com (Netflix, Inc.) (Fleischer, Robert)
April 6, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Donald Trump to 6/1/2020. (Smith, E)
April 6, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Disney to 6/1/2020. (Smith, E)
April 3, 2020 Filing 14 Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Morgan Stanley Co., LLC re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 7, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs pleading (Machcinski, Victor)
April 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2020 to respond to complaint #1 Notice of Removal by Disney. (Bertrand, Raymond)
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond W. Bertrand on behalf of Disney (Bertrand, Raymond)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 7, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs pleading by Morgan Stanley Co., LLC. (Machcinski, Victor)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor A. Machcinski, Jr on behalf of Morgan Stanley Co., LLC (Machcinski, Victor)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2020 to respond to complaint #1 Notice of Removal by Donald Trump. (Turbert, Julie)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Certificate of Service filed by Donald Trump, #7 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Donald Trump, #4 Notice of No Pending Motions filed by Donald Trump, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Julie G. Turbert on behalf of Donald Trump Signed by Clerk on 04/01/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/31/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/31/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2020. Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2020. Signed by Clerk on 03/31/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Donald Trump re #1 Notice of Removal of No Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket)(Turbert, Julie)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie G. Turbert on behalf of Donald Trump (Turbert, Julie)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Trump re #1 Notice of Removal (Turbert, Julie)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Donald Trump from New London Superior Court, case number KNL-CV-20-5021345-S., filed by Donald Trump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Turbert, Julie)
March 31, 2020 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gebbie v. Morgan Stanley Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Co., LLC
Represented By: Victor A. Machcinski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix.com
Represented By: Ilene Susan Farkas, I
Represented By: Robert M. Fleischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney
Represented By: Raymond W. Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon
Represented By: John M. Magliery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Gebbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?