Scalia v. Local 933, New Haven Federation of Teachers
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Defendant: Local 933, New Haven Federation of Teachers
Case Number: 3:2020cv00458
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Bellotti on behalf of Local 933, New Haven Federation of Teachers (Bellotti, Adam)
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce R. Lerner on behalf of Local 933, New Haven Federation of Teachers (Lerner, Bruce)
May 28, 2020 Answer deadline updated to 6/16/2020 per Dkt. 12. (Shafer, J.)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Attorney Bruce Lerner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/28/2020. (Velez, F.)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Attorney Adam Bellotti to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/28/2020. (Velez, F.)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint until 06/16/2020. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/28/2020. (Nault, James)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bruce R. Lerner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5879732) by Local 933, New Haven Federation of Teachers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Murray, Henry)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam Bellotti to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5879707) by Local 933, New Haven Federation of Teachers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Murray, Henry)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/16/2020 Answer or Otherwise Plead #1 Complaint by Local 933, New Haven Federation of Teachers. (Murray, Henry)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry F. Murray on behalf of Local 933, New Haven Federation of Teachers (Murray, Henry)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Local 933, New Haven Federation of Teachers waiver sent on 4/3/2020, answer due 6/2/2020 filed by Eugene Scalia. (Sciarrino, Christine)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Eugene Scalia, #4 Protective Order, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/3/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/3/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/3/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2020; Discovery due by 10/3/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 11/7/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 3, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Local 933, New Haven Federation of Teachers, filed by Eugene Scalia.(Sciarrino, Christine) Modified on 4/3/2020 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Local 933, New Haven Federation of Teachers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 933, New Haven Federation of Teachers
Represented By: Henry F. Murray
Represented By: Bruce R. Lerner
Represented By: Adam Bellotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Christine L. Sciarrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?