New Prime Inc v. AEDS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: New Prime Inc
Defendant: AEDS, LLC and James S. Augustus
Case Number: 3:2020cv00469
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time until June 13, 2020 for Defendants to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/14/2020. (Conde, Djenab)
May 14, 2020 Answer deadline updated for AEDS, LLC to 6/13/2020; James S. Augustus to 6/13/2020. Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/29/2020. (Perez, J.)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/13/2020 responsive pleading to complaint #1 Complaint by AEDS, LLC, James S. Augustus. (Sanchez, Cassandra)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Lynn Sanchez on behalf of AEDS, LLC, James S. Augustus (Sanchez, Cassandra)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Angeline Nicole Ioannou on behalf of AEDS, LLC, James S. Augustus (Ioannou, Angeline)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Prime Inc. AEDS, LLC served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020; James S. Augustus served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. (Kenney, Michael)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Prime Inc. (Kenney, Michael)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *James S. Augustus* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael P. Kenney* *Ryan Ryan Deluca LLP - HRTFD* *CityPlace II, 185 Asylum St., 6th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *AEDS, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael P. Kenney* *Ryan Ryan Deluca LLP - HRTFD* *CityPlace II, 185 Asylum St., 6th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by New Prime Inc Signed by Clerk on 04/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2020. Discovery due by 10/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/10/2020. Signed by Clerk on 04/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5787255.), filed by New Prime, Inc..(Kenney, Michael)
April 6, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to AEDS, LLC. (Kenney, Michael)
April 6, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 6, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to James S. Augustus. (Kenney, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Prime Inc v. AEDS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEDS, LLC
Represented By: Cassandra Lynn Sanchez
Represented By: Angeline Nicole Ioannou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Augustus
Represented By: Cassandra Lynn Sanchez
Represented By: Angeline Nicole Ioannou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Prime Inc
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?