Citino v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Joseph Citino
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00477
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within thirty days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within fourteen days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty-four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties must file on or before 6/10/2020: (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a form 26(f) report; or (2) a form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Clerk on 5/27/2020. (Shafer, J.)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard Merrill Isaac on behalf of Joseph Citino (Isaac, Leonard)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice (Other) filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp., #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp., #2 Notice (Other) filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp., #6 Standing Protect ive Order, #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Velez, F.)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/8/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/8/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/8/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/7/2020; Discovery due by 10/8/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 8, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by American Strategic Insurance Corp. of Pending Motions (Cannavino, John)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by American Strategic Insurance Corp. of Statement on Standing Order on Removed Cases (Cannavino, John)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Strategic Insurance Corp. from Connecticut Superior Court, case number N/A. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5792184, filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Summons and Complaint)(Cannavino, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citino v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: John Wade Cannavino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Citino
Represented By: Brian R. Parrott
Represented By: Leonard Merrill Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?