Knox v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Eileen Knox
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00492
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER ON JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDUM attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/11/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
May 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 8077899. (D'Amato, Joseph)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. The Court has reviewed the parties' #13 Rule 26(f) Report and held a Rule 16(b) Conference on May 11, 2020. The Rule 26(f) Report is Approved, Adopted, and So Ordered, except as may be set forth below. Pursuant to Local Rule 16(b), the Court orders as follows: The Plaintiff shall move to amend the pleadings or move to join additional parties by August 3, 2020. The Defendant shall move to join additional parties or file a response to the complaint, or any amended complaint, by August 3, 2020. All discovery shall be completed by April 3, 2021. Dispositive motions, if any (see Local Rule 56(c)), shall be filed by December 29, 2020. The joint trial memorandum shall be filed by July 3, 2021. The joint trial memorandum shall comport with this Court's standing order, which will be separately docketed. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for April 12, 2021 at 10:00 AM. Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff shall move to amend the pleadings or move to join additional parties by August 3, 2020;Defendant shall move to join additional parties or file a response to the complaint, or any amended complaint, by August 3, 2020;Discovery due by April 3, 2021; Dispositive Motions due by December 29, 2020;Joint Trial Memorandum due by July 3, 2021;Telephonic Status Conference set for April 12, 2021 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/11/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
May 11, 2020 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/11/2020. Total Time: 12 minutes(Court Reporter Tracy Gow.) (Gould, K.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 8077899. (D'Amato, Joseph)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER regarding Pretrial Deadlines. The Court has reviewed the parties' #13 Rule 26(f) Report. The Court has questions regarding case management and the 26(f) Report. The parties shall appear for a telephonic scheduling conference on May 11, 2020 at 10:00 AM. A calendar entry with the details for this conference will be separately docketed. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/6/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Esty, Miles)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation, filed by Eileen Knox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Leave Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Request for Leave Exhibit B)(Majewski, John)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Majewski on behalf of Eileen Knox (Majewski, John)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Esty, Miles)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Miles David Newman Esty on behalf Costco Wholesale Corporation, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, #2 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, #3 Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, #8 Standing Protective Order, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Add and Terminate Judges, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 04/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 04/13/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 04/13/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2020. Discovery due by 10/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 04/13/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 13, 2020 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Esty, Miles)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Miles David Newman Esty on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Esty, Miles)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Esty, Miles)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Notice of Pending Motions) (Esty, Miles)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale Corporation Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5799212, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Esty, Miles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Miles David Newman Esty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Knox
Represented By: John P. Majewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?