Shepardson v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Virginia Shepardson
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, LLC and dormakaba USA, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Automatic Door Dr. Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00503
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 28 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Fourth Party Complaint against Automatic Door Dr. Inc., filed by dormakaba USA, Inc..(Michienzie, Paul)
June 11, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by dormakaba USA, Inc. of Filing of Fourth Party Complaint (Michienzie, Paul)
June 11, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to #17 Third Party Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by dormakaba USA, Inc..(Michienzie, Paul)
June 11, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by dormakaba USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent KABA U.S. Holding Ltd, Corporate Parent dormakaba Schweiz AG., Corporate Parent dormakaba International Holding AG for dormakaba USA, Inc.. (Michienzie, Paul)
June 11, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Michienzie on behalf of dormakaba USA, Inc. (Michienzie, Paul)
May 22, 2020 Filing 23 Third Party SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVS Pharmacy, LLC. dormakaba USA, Inc. served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Han, Young)
May 18, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached Order. Discovery due by 12/15/2020; Initial Status Report due by 6/18/2020; Prefiling Conference Re: Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2020; Settlement Conference 1/2021; Trial Ready Date 5/3/2021; Trial Brief due by 3/1/2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/18/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Virginia Shepardson. (McCoy, William)
May 8, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *dormakaba USA, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Young B. Han* *Davids & Cohen, P.C.* *40 Washington St., Suite 20* *Wellesley, MA 02481*. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 8, 2020 Filing 18 ENTERED IN ERROR - ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *dormakaba USA, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Young B. Han* *Davids & Cohen, P.C.* *40 Washington St., Suite 20* *Wellesley, MA 02481*. (Agati, Kathryn) Modified on 5/8/2020 to enter in error (Agati, Kathryn).
May 7, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to dormakaba USA, Inc.. (Han, Young)
May 7, 2020 Filing 17 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against dormakaba USA, Inc., filed by CVS Pharmacy, LLC.(Han, Young)
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, LLC of Filing Third-Party Complaint (Han, Young)
May 4, 2020 Docket Entry Correction re #8 - modified docket text to reflect title of document. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 4, 2020 Docket Entry Correction - Document #15 Entered in Error - Per the local rules, discovery is not to be filed. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 ENTERED IN ERROR - NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, LLC of Initial Disclosures (Han, Young) Modified on 5/4/2020 (Agati, Kathryn).
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Han, Young)
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 CONNECTICUT CVS PHARMACY, LLC ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by CVS Pharmacy, LLC.(Han, Young)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Virginia Shepardson.(McCoy, William)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Han, Young)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Serving Court Orders (Han, Young)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Han, Young)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 DEFENDANT, CVS PHARMACY, INC.S CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Serving Court Orders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Han, Young) Modified docket text to reflect title of document on 5/4/2020 (Agati, Kathryn).
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Young B. Han on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Han, Young)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #2 Notice (Other) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES) (Agati, Kathryn)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/15/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/15/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2020, Discovery due by 10/15/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
April 15, 2020 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. of pending motions (Han, Young)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. from New London Superior, case number KNL-CV20-6046004-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5803829, filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, Summons, Return of Service, #2 Exhibit Corporate summary, #3 Exhibit Corporate summary)(Han, Young)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepardson v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Young B. Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Shepardson
Represented By: William E. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Young B. Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: dormakaba USA, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Michienzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Automatic Door Dr. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?