Troiano v. Ernst & Young U.S. LLP's Long Term Disability Program et al
Plaintiff: Debra Troiano
Defendant: Ernst & Young U.S. LLP's Long Term Disability Program, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00511
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aetna Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/5/2020 filed by Debra Troiano. (Bucci, Thomas)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed by Debra Troiano.(Bucci, Thomas)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 motion for order. The court hereby enters the following orders: 1) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 19, 20 and 21, the plaintiff may add Aetna Life Insurance Company as a defendant in this case; 2) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 19, 20 and 21, the plaintiff may remove the Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., and the Ernst & Young U.S., LLP Long Term Disability Program as defendants in this action; and 3) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(d), the plaintiff may file and to serve upon Aetna Life Insurance Company, the appended First Substituted Complaint. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 04/29/20. (Codeanne, K.)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Add a Party and Drop Parties and Amend Complaint Order by Debra Troiano. (Bucci, Thomas)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ernst & Young U.S. LLP's Long Term Disability Program, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas W. Bucci* *Willinger, Willinger & Bucci, P.C.* *855 Main St., Fifth Floor* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Bozek, M.)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Debra Troiano, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2020.(Bozek, M.)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 4/16/2020.(Bozek, M.)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2020. Discovery due by 10/16/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/20/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2020.(Bozek, M.)
April 16, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 16, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ernst & Young U.S. LLP's Long Term Disability Program, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. (Bucci, Thomas) Modified to update parties on 4/16/2020 (Anastasio, F.).
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ernst & Young U.S. LLP's Long Term Disability Program, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5805690.), filed by Debra Troiano.(Bucci, Thomas) Modified to update parties on 4/16/2020 (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troiano v. Ernst & Young U.S. LLP's Long Term Disability Program et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernst & Young U.S. LLP's Long Term Disability Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Troiano
Represented By: Thomas W. Bucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?