Sharinn et al v. Century Financial Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Noa Sharinn and Todd S. Sharinn
Defendant: Century Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00548
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Century Financial Services, Inc..(Alward, Jill)
May 28, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Century Financial Services, Inc. to 6/10/2020. Set Deadlines:Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/13/2020. (Perez, J.)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/28/2020. (Garcia, A.)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 10, 2020 to file Answer or Other Response (Nunc Pro Tunc) #1 Complaint by Century Financial Services, Inc.. (Alward, Jill)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill E. Alward on behalf of Century Financial Services, Inc. (Alward, Jill)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd S. Sharinn. Century Financial Services, Inc. served on 4/27/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Sharinn, Todd)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Century Financial Services, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd S. Sharinn* *Gilbride, Tusa, Last & Spellane-CT* *31 Brookside Dr., PO Box 658* *Greenwich, CT 06830*. (Fazekas, J.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Todd S. Sharinn, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 04/24/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 24, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Century Financial Services, Inc.. (Sharinn, Todd)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/23/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/23/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/22/2020. Discovery due by 10/23/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 04/23/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 23, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Century Financial Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5819129.), filed by Todd S. Sharinn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharinn, Todd) Modified on 4/23/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharinn et al v. Century Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noa Sharinn
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd S. Sharinn
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?