Merholz et al v. McMahon et al
Plaintiff: Melvyn Klein and Ryan Merholz
Defendant: Paul Levesque, Alan M. Wexler, Laureen Ong, George A. Barrios, Robyn W. Peterson, Vincent K. McMahon, Stephanie McMahon, Frank A. Riddick, III, Jeffrey R. Speed, Man Jit Singh, Stuart U Goldfarb, Stuart U. Goldfarb and Michelle D Wilson
Nominal Defendant: World Wrestling Entertainment and World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00557
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D Wilson, filed by Melvyn Klein, Ryan Merholz.(Egleston, Gregory)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Frank A. Riddick, III waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020; Jeffrey R. Speed waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020; Vincent K. McMahon waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020; Stuart U. Goldfarb waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020; Robyn W. Peterson waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020; Alan M. Wexler waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020; World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020; Laureen Ong waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020; Stephanie McMahon waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020; Man Jit Singh waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020; George A. Barrios waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020; Paul Levesque waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/3/2020 filed by Melvyn Klein; Ryan Merholz. (Egleston, Gregory)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Melvyn Klein, Ryan Merholz, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 04/27/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/24/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/24/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/23/2020. Discovery due by 10/24/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/28/2020. Signed by the Clerk on 04/24/2020.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 4/27/2020 to correct filer (Fazekas, J.).
April 24, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George A. Barrios, Stuart U Goldfarb, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, World Wrestling Entertainment ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5822444.), filed by Melvyn Klein, Ryan Merholz.(Egleston, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merholz et al v. McMahon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Levesque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan M. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laureen Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent K. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank A. Riddick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Speed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Man Jit Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart U Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart U. Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle D Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: World Wrestling Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvyn Klein
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Merholz
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?