In re: Booker
Appellant: Ulish Booker, III
Not Classified By Court: US Trustee
Interested Party: Roberta Napolitano
In Re: Ulish Booker, Jr
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2020cv00562
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. First, Appellant's motion fails to comply with Local Rule 7(b), pursuant to which, the movant must "include a statement of the movant that (1) the movant has inquired of all non-moving parties and there is agreement or objection to the motion, or that (2) despite diligent effort, including making the inquiry in sufficient time to afford non-movant a reasonable opportunity to respond, the movant cannot ascertain the position(s) of the non-movant(s)." Second, the duration of the requested extension (60 days) is itself unreasonable as it seeks an extension that is twice the length of presumptively reasonable period set forth in Bankruptcy Rule 8018. The Court will grant a 28 day extension. All future filings must comport with the Local Rules, which are applicable to pro se parties and attorneys appearing before this Court. The Appellant's brief is due in no event later than 07/29/2020. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/25/2020. (Diamond, Matthew)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant Brief by Ulish Booker, III. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Reis, Julia) Modified on 6/18/2020 to correct file date (Reis, Julia).
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE: A record on appeal in the above-entitled matter was transmitted to the District Court by the US Bankruptcy Court on 6/1/2020 and entered on the docket on 6/1/2020 pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules. The Appellant and Appellee shall serve and file their briefs pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8018. Appellant Brief due by 7/1/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/1/2020.(Fanelle, N.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 No Designation/Agreed Statement Filed 20-562 (VLB)(RE:) 172 Notice of Appeal to District Court filed by Ulish Booker, III., Creditor Re: 149 Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration. Fee Amount of $298 not paid. Appellant, Ulish Booker, III. Appellee(s), U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee For Truman 2016 SC6. Appellant Designation or Agreed Statement due by 5/7/2020. Transmission of Designation due by 5/26/2020. filed by Creditor Ulish Booker III. (Fanelle, N.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: A notice of appeal was transmitted by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court on 4/27/2020 and entered on the docket on 4/27/2020. The appellant and appellee shall comply with Bankruptcy Rule 8009. Within 14 days, the appellant shall file a notice with this Court either that appellant has filed with the Bankruptcy Court a designation and statement in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 8009(a)(1)(B), or that the parties have prepared an agreed statement in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 8009(d), and attach to the notice a copy of such filing. Failure to comply with this notice may result in the case being dismissed. Designation Notice due by: 5/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/27/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/27/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/27/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/27/2020.(Fanelle, N.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 19-30787, filed by Ulish Booker, III. (Attachments: #1 Fee Application, #2 Bankruptcy Order)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ulish Booker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Roberta Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Ulish Booker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Sara Gould
Represented By: Sara Michele Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?