Diblasi v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Frank Diblasi
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc. and Heraeus, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00566
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: In light of plaintiff's #16 amended complaint, the #13 motion to dismiss the complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/17/20. (Constantine, A.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Frank Diblasi.(Mowad, George)
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lyons, Thomas)
May 27, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss .(Responses due by 6/16/2020, ), or( Amended Complaint due by 6/16/2020) (Johnson, D.)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendant has filed a #13 Motion to Dismiss. On or before June 16, 2020, Plaintiff shall either file a response to the motion or file an amended complaint in which it pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Rule 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in Defendant's memorandum of law. The Court will not allow further amendments after June 16, 2020. If Plaintiff chooses to amend and if Defendant renews its motion to dismiss, Defendant may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/27/20.(Constantine, A.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Smith & Nephew, Inc..Responses due by 6/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Lyons, Thomas)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/21/20. (Constantine, A.)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/25/2020 To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Lyons, Thomas)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by George G. Mowad, II on behalf of Frank Diblasi (Mowad, George)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc., #7 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc., #8 Protective Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc., #5 Notice (Other) filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 04/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Peterson, M)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. Of No Pending Motions (Lyons, Thomas)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Cornelius Danaher, Jr on behalf of Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Danaher, R.)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/27/2020. (Peterson, M)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/27/2020. (Peterson, M)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/26/2020. Discovery due by 10/27/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Clerk on 04/27/2020. (Peterson, M)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Lyons, Thomas)
April 27, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Lyons, Thomas)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith & Nephew, Inc. from Superior Court Judicial District of Waterbury, case number UWY-CV-20-6054310-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5824878, filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diblasi v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: R. Cornelius Danaher, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heraeus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Diblasi
Represented By: George G. Mowad, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?