Berger v. Hartford Auto Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ruben Lemar Berger
Defendant: Hartford Auto Group, Inc., Straits Turnpike Automotive, LLC and Santander Consumer USA Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00572
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The plaintiff's #10 notice of voluntary dismissal is APPROVED. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/10/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Hartford Auto Group, Inc., Straits Turnpike Automotive, LLC and Santander Consumer USA Inc. by Ruben Lemar Berger (Blinn, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Santander Consumer USA Inc waiver sent on 4/29/2020, answer due 6/28/2020 filed by Ruben Lemar Berger. (Blinn, Daniel)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Grant on behalf of Santander Consumer USA Inc (Grant, Michael)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruben Lemar Berger. Straits Turnpike Automotive, LLC served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (Blinn, Daniel)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Auto Group, Inc., Santander Consumer USA Inc, Straits Turnpike Automotive, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Peterson, M)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Ruben Lemar Berger, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 04/28/2020. (Peterson, M)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/28/2020. (Peterson, M)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/28/2020.(Peterson, M)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/27/2020. Discovery due by 10/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2020. Signed by Clerk on 04/28/2020. (Peterson, M)
April 28, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
April 28, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Straits Turnpike Automotive, LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)
April 28, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Santander Consumer USA Inc. (Blinn, Daniel)
April 28, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Auto Group, Inc.. (Blinn, Daniel)
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Auto Group, Inc., Santander Consumer USA Inc, Straits Turnpike Automotive, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5826189.), filed by Ruben Lemar Berger.(Blinn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger v. Hartford Auto Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Auto Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Straits Turnpike Automotive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Lemar Berger
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?