Acevedo v. Zahariades
Plaintiff: Sandra Acevedo
Defendant: Despina Zahariades
Case Number: 3:2020cv00581
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of New Haven. (Shafer, J.)
May 12, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order REMANDING case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, as the parties' stipulation at #11 provides that the amount in controversy does not exceed $75,000.00 as required by 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/12/2020.(Diamond, Matthew)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION by Despina Zahariades. (Berglund, Curtis)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Despina Zahariades.(Berglund, Curtis)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Despina Zahariades Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases (Berglund, Curtis)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Despina Zahariades, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Despina Zahariades, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Despina Zahariades, #6 Standing Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Velez, F.)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/29/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/29/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/29/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2020; Discovery due by 10/30/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/29/2020. (Velez, F.) Modified on 4/30/2020 to correct filing date (Velez, F.).
April 29, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Despina Zahariades of No Pending Motions (Berglund, Curtis)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis A Berglund on behalf of Despina Zahariades (Berglund, Curtis)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Despina Zahariades from Superior Court, J.D. of New Haven Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5829318, filed by Despina Zahariades. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons, #2 Exhibit B: Complaint, #3 Exhibit C: Officer's Return, #4 Exhibit D: Notice of Removal -State, #5 E: C.A. Cover Sheet)(Berglund, Curtis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acevedo v. Zahariades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Despina Zahariades
Represented By: Curtis A Berglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Acevedo
Represented By: Colleen G. Casini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?