Linnon et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Linnon and Marlene Linnon
Defendant: Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00596
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Alfred V. Covello for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/11/2020.(Perez, J.)
May 4, 2020 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon Inc. (Simpson, Robert)
May 4, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren R. Greenspoon on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Greenspoon, Lauren)
May 4, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Reginald Simpson on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Simpson, Robert)
April 30, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE TO COUNSEL IN TRANSFERRED CASE. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/20.(Imbriani, Susan)
April 30, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/20.(Imbriani, Susan)
April 30, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2020.(Imbriani, Susan)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/30/2020.(Imbriani, Susan)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/30/2020.(Imbriani, Susan)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2020; Discovery due by 10/30/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2020.(Imbriani, Susan)
April 30, 2020 Filing 38 Case electronically transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-13125.
April 30, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Walker, J.)
April 23, 2020 Filing 37 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #26 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1986) Pls Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1988) Pls Mem in Support of Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2143) Defs Resp to Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3844) Pls Reply to Notice of Adoption of Prior Response of Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6864) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6973) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7119) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr.)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
April 23, 2020 Filing 36 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #26 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3617) Pls Mot to Exclude John R. Wagner, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3618) - Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude John R. Wagner, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3851) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude John R. Wagner, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (4920) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude John R. Wagner, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6861) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude John R. Wagner, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6991) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude John R. Wagner, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7144) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude John R. Wagner)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
April 23, 2020 Filing 35 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #26 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6860) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
April 23, 2020 Filing 34 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #26 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3658) Pls Mot to Exclude Ted Roth, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3668) - Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Ted Roth, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3755) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Ted Roth, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3857) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Ted Roth, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6845) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Ted Roth, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7039) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Ted Roth, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7108) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Ted Roth)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
April 23, 2020 Filing 33 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #26 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (6824) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (6998) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (7100) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
April 23, 2020 Filing 32 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #26 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #27 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #28 Exhibit MDL ECF (6852) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #29 Exhibit MDL ECF (6960) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
April 23, 2020 Filing 31 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #26 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2079) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2079) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2080) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #4 Envelope MDL ECF (2148) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2229) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3019) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3592) - Defs Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3594) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3788) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3845) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6786) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot and Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6930) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
April 23, 2020 Filing 30 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #26 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2200) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6648) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6833) Amended Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6926) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7123) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
April 23, 2020 Filing 29 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #26 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
April 23, 2020 Filing 28 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #26 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3621) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 3 - Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6875) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (7038) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7045) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7085) Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7183) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
April 23, 2020 Filing 27 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #26 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to add party filers) (msa).
April 23, 2020 Filing 26 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to add party filers)(msa).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 4/30/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 4/29/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/16/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st)
April 24, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William)
April 22, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Marlene Linnon, Richard Linnon (Balefsky, Lee)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (sak) (ADI)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI)
October 25, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Marlene Linnon, Richard Linnon in opposition to #16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee)
October 25, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Marlene Linnon, Richard Linnon in opposition to #16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Balefsky, Lee)
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William)
October 15, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William)
August 16, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER The #12 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/14/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: Cases Listed on Appendix A & B) (mek)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (brn) (ADI)
June 13, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing and Supporting Memorandum (Gage, William)
May 21, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and Requests for Admission. (Moriarty, Matthew) (Modified on 5/23/2018 to remove party filer) (kp).
May 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Marlene Linnon on May 7, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Moriarty, Matthew)
May 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Matthew P. Moriarty on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Moriarty, Matthew)
March 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of #6 Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Gage, William)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI)
January 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Raul Mendelovici on 4/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Gage, William)
June 8, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Marlene Linnon, Richard Linnon. (Jimenez, Priscilla)
November 9, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy)
October 23, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David)
September 15, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 195 (First Amended Docket Control Order - Wave 1 Cases) entered on 09/03/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (kp)
September 14, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4118060. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linnon et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Linnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Linnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Lauren R. Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Lauren R. Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?