Abernathy v. Commissioner of Correction et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Abernathy
Defendant: Warden, John Doe and Commissioner of Correction
Case Number: 3:2020cv00628
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eddie Abernathy.Responses due by 7/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 6/8/20. (Payton, R.)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eddie Abernathy. (Fazekas, J.)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis. You must submit the attached Prisoner's IFP application which is being sent to you via U.S.mail. Also, you must submit a ledger sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 6/1/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 5/11/20.(Payton, R.)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. For the reasons stated in the attached order, the #3 motion to appoint counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/8/2020. (Garcia, A.)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 05/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS - MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eddie Abernathy. (Fazekas, J.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Abernathy. (Fazekas, J.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Correction, John Doe, Warden, filed by Eddie Abernathy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abernathy v. Commissioner of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?