Cylwik v. Home Depot USA Inc
Plaintiff: Teresa Cylwik
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00660
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of Fairfield at Bridgeport. (Bozek, M.)
May 14, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bozek, M.)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Consent Motion to Withdraw Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/14/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
May 14, 2020 Docket Entry Correction re #5 Electronic Filing Order. Modified to correct signature date from 4/13/2020 to 5/13/2020. (Bozek, M.)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Standing Protective Order, #3 MOTION to Withdraw Notice of Removal filed by Home Depot USA Inc, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Home Depot USA Inc, #5 Electronic Filing Order, and #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Home Depot USA Inc. Signed by Clerk on 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Bozek, M.)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/13/2020.(Bozek, M.)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/13/2020.(Bozek, M.) Modified on 5/14/2020 to correct signature date (Bozek, M.).
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2020. Discovery due by 11/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2020.(Bozek, M.)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Withdraw Notice of Removal by Home Depot USA Inc. (Lapish, Caroline)
May 13, 2020 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Lapish, Caroline)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from Bridgeport Superior Court, case number FBT-CV20-6096683-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5854813, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lapish, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cylwik v. Home Depot USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Represented By: Caroline B. Lapish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Cylwik
Represented By: Michael E. Skiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?